Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jane Triche Milazzo
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:18-cv-06936
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 9:59 AM CST
Defendant
Shapiro Dimitri Medical, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Steven Shapiro
Represented By
Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Capitelli And Wicker
contact info
Brian J. Capitelli
Capitelli & Wicker
contact info
Defendant
Regional Support Services, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Precision Medical Billing Services, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Joel Perdomo
Represented By
Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Capitelli And Wicker
contact info
Brian J. Capitelli
Capitelli & Wicker
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Orgeron
Represented By
Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Capitelli And Wicker
contact info
Brian J. Capitelli
Capitelli & Wicker
contact info
Defendant
Mississippi Support Solutions, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Mississippi Dermatology, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Karen Drake
Represented By
Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Capitelli And Wicker
contact info
Brian J. Capitelli
Capitelli & Wicker
contact info
Defendant
Dimitri Clinics, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Dimitri
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
E.M. Dimitri
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Defendant
Dermatologic Centers of America, LLC
Represented By
Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Capitelli And Wicker
contact info
Brian J. Capitelli
Capitelli & Wicker
contact info
Defendant
American Medical Support Services, LLC
Represented By
James Walter Frazer Green, I
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (baton Rouge)
contact info
Movant
Louisiana State
Represented By
Julie Hatcher Ralph
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Nicholas J. Diez
La
contact info
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Sandra Lee Sears
U.S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Mimi Tuong Nguyen
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Whiteman
Represented By
Jody Forester Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info
Mary Bubbett Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Ford
Represented By
Jody Forester Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info
Mary Bubbett Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Albores
Represented By
Jody Forester Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info
Mary Bubbett Jackson
Jackson & Jackson
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2025
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' case against Defendants Karen Drake; Thomas Orgeron, M.D.; Joel Perdomo, M.D.; and Steven Shapiro, M.D. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs' ability to move for leave to amend the Complaint within twenty (20) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/20/2025. (amj)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
90 90 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/15 3:03 PM
ORDER granting89 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to American Medical Support Services, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Dermatologic Centers of America, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; E.M. Dimitri answer due 5/15/2025; Elizabeth Dimitri answer due 5/15/2025; Dimitri Clinics, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Mississippi Dermatology, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Mississippi Support Solutions, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Thomas Orgeron answer due 5/15/2025; Joel Perdomo answer due 5/15/2025; Precision Medical Billing Services, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Regional Support Services, LLC answer due 5/15/2025; Shapiro Dimitri Medical, LLC answer due 5/15/2025. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 04/15/2025. (go)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
89 89 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/14 2:01 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re88 Amended Complaint, by American Medical Support Services, LLC, Dermatologic Centers of America, LLC, E.M. Dimitri, Elizabeth Dimitri, Dimitri Clinics, LLC, Mississippi Dermatology, LLC, Mississippi Support Solutions, LLC, Thomas Orgeron, Joel Perdomo, Precision Medical Billing Services, LLC, Regional Support Services, LLC, Shapiro Dimitri Medical, LLC.(Green, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
88 88 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/10 5:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED JOINT COMPLAINT against American Medical Support Services, LLC, Dermatologic Centers of America, LLC, E.M. Dimitri, Elizabeth Dimitri, Dimitri Clinics, LLC, Karen Drake, Mississippi Dermatology, LLC, Mississippi Support Solutions, LLC, Thomas Orgeron, Joel Perdomo, Precision Medical Billing Services, LLC, Regional Support Services, LLC, Steven Shapiro, Shapiro Dimitri Medical, LLC filed by United States of America, Louisiana State.(go)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
87 87 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 04/10 4:50 PM
ORDER granting86 Motion to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the First Amended Joint Complaint and accompanying Exhibits attached to Plaintiffs Request for Leave to File be filed into this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 04/10/2025. (go)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
86 86 3 pgs motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/09 7:02 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by United States of America, Louisiana State.(Sears, Sandra) Modified text/filers on 4/10/2025 (go).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 54 pgs Proposed Pleading,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 9 1 pgs Proposed Order