Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00324
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Kenneth Kleinhenz (1)
Represented By
David L. Doughten
Law Office Of David L. Doughten
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elliot D. Morrison
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info

GPO Oct 18 2024
Order: Without objection from any party, the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 14). Therefore, the Court accepts Defendant's guilty plea and enters it accordingly. The Defendant is referred to the United States Pretrial and Probation Department for the preparation of a Presentence Report. Sentencing in this matter is scheduled for January 28, 2025, at 12:00 p.m., in Courtroom 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. No later than January 21, 2025, sentencing memoranda, including any and all documents or other materials counsel wish the Court to consider at sentencing, are due. If there is a factual dispute on which testimony is expected at the sentencing hearing, the parties are directed to advise the Court as soon as possible so that the Court may set up a pre-sentencing hearing to discuss logistics for the sentencing hearing. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on October 18, 2024. (Y,A)

Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 3:51 AM EDT
Thursday, March 03, 2022
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney David L. Doughten for Kenneth Kleinhenz. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 3/3/2022. (D,JJ) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to Seal Case by United States of America as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1). (D,JJ) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order granting Government's3 Motion to Seal Case as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 3/3/2022. (D,JJ) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
Judge update in case as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1). Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd added. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker no longer assigned to case. (L,MI) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
5 5 Motion to Unseal Case by United States of America as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1).. (L,MI) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 Order granting Government's5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1). Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 9/10/2024. (D,JJ) [1:22-mj-03059-RJS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Information filed by USA as to Kenneth Kleinhenz (1) count(s) 1. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Indictment,
Att: 2 Designation Form