Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00237
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Garfet Todd Patton (1)
Represented By
David P. Cherundolo
Law Office'S Of David Cherundolo
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Probation - Scranton Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Luisa Honora Berti
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2024 3:46 AM EDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
1 1 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Garfet Patton (1). (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal the Affidavit to the Criminal Complaint filed in the above captioned matter by USA as to Garfet Patton.(kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Affidavit in case as to Garfet Patton (1). Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on September 5, 2024. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 CJA 23 - FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Garfet Patton. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING CJA ATTORNEY David P. Cherundolo in case as to Garfet Patton.Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on September 6, 2024. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Garfet Patton. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Garfet Patton. A Detention Hearing is set for 9/10/2024 at 1:30 PM in Scranton - Courtroom 2 before Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom. *If an Indictment is returned, arraignment will be held.* Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on September 6, 2024. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs RULE 5 NOTICE re: Brady disclosure obligations as to defendant Garfet Patton. Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on September 6, 2024. (kjn) [1:24-mj-00071-DFB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 7 pgs INDICTMENT WITH FORFEITURE ALLEGATION as to Garfet Todd Patton (1) count(s) 1-3, 4. (dw)
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Document. (dw)
Related: [-]
16 16 Criminal Cover Sheet (Access Restricted to Court Users) -. (dw)
Related: [-]
18 18 RULE 5 NOTICE re: Brady disclosure obligations as to defendant Garfet Todd Patton. Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on 9/10/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED as to counts 1-4 of the Indictment as to Garfet Todd Patton (sm)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Garfet Todd Patton Signed by Chief MJ Daryl F. Bloom on 9/10/24. (sm)
Related: [-]