California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:24-mc-80228
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 2:48 PM PDT
In Re
BELIFT LAB, Inc.
Represented By
Ray Seilie
Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP
contact info
Timothy Bahk Yoo
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks & Nessim LLP
contact info
In Re
HYBE Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Ray Seilie
Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP
contact info
Timothy Bahk Yoo
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks & Nessim LLP
contact info
In Re
SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd.
Represented By
Ray Seilie
Bird, Marella, Rhow, Lincenberg, Drooks & Nessim, LLP
contact info
Timothy Bahk Yoo
Bird Marella Rhow Lincenberg Drooks & Nessim LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Google LLC
Represented By
Byron R. Tuyay
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Nicholas OBrian Kennedy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 order Order Wed 02/05 5:46 PM
ORDER: On 11/27/2024, the court's 13 order directed Applicants to serve a finalized subpoena on Google, after which Google had 30 days to serve a copy of the subpoena on each individual associated with the YouTube Channels. From there, Google and individuals associated with the YouTube Channels were allowed 30 calendar days from the date of service upon them to file any motions in this court contesting the subpoena. Applicants served Google on 11/27/2024 (see Docket No. 14 ), and both 30-day periods have now elapsed. Having not received any objections, the court will close this case by Friday, 2/7/2025, unless the court is notified otherwise on a showing of good cause. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/5/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
14 14 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 12/05 4:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HYBE Co., Ltd., BELIFT LAB, Inc., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd. re13 Order re SERVICE OF SUBPOENA AND ORDER ON REGISTERED AGENT FOR GOOGLE LLC (Seilie, Ray)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 6 pgs order Order Wed 11/27 10:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/27/2024. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/11 5:04 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Tuyay, Byron)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 10/11 5:02 PM
Statement of Non-Opposition re1 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening),,, for Order Authorizing Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 filed byGoogle LLC. Related [+] (Tuyay, Byron)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/04 6:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Google LLC is a subsidiary of XXVI Holdings Inc., which is a subsidiary of Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. is a publicly traded company; no publicly traded company holds more than 10% of Alphabet Inc.'s stock for Google LLC. and Corporate Disclosure (Tuyay, Byron)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 10/04 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Byron R. Tuyay on behalf of Google LLC (Tuyay, Byron)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nicholas OBrian Kennedy on behalf of Google LLC (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
7 7 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/23 3:57 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BELIFT LAB, Inc., HYBE Co., Ltd., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd... (Seilie, Ray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/19 10:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BELIFT LAB, Inc., HYBE Co., Ltd., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd. re4 Order on Registered Agent for Google LLC (Seilie, Ray)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 09/13 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Ray Seilie on behalf of BELIFT LAB, Inc., HYBE Co., Ltd., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd. (Seilie, Ray)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/13 9:31 AM
ORDER re: 1 Ex Parte Application filed by HYBE Co., Ltd., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd., BELIFT LAB, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/13/2024. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/10 11:55 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
2 2 2 pgs Certificate of Interested Entities by BELIFT LAB, Inc., HYBE Co., Ltd., SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd. for SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd.; Corporate Parent BELIFT LAB, Inc. for BELIFT LAB, Inc.; Corporate Parent HYBE CO. Ltd. for HYBE Co., Ltd.. (Yoo, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Authorizing Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to USC Sec 1782 against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19826496.). Filed by SOURCE MUSIC CO. Ltd., BELIFT LAB, Inc., HYBE Co., Ltd..(Yoo, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Jong-Uk Park iso Ex Parte Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Park Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Park Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Park Declaration,
Att: 5 11 pgs Exhibit 4 to Park Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Park Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Park Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Park Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Park Declaration,
Att: 10 Declaration of Wook Ki Lee iso Ex Parte Application,
Att: 11 Proposed Order,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet