Original Case: 3:20-cv-01432

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-civil-01822
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
COMISION ESTATAL DE ELECCIONES
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JESSIKA D. PADILLA RIVERA, in her official capacity as Acting President of the Comision Estatal de Elecciones
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EFRAIN COLON-DAMIANI
Represented By
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Fermin L. Arraiza-Navas
ACLU-PR
contact info
Lissette Duran
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Theresa J. Lee
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BELIA ARLENE OCASIO
Represented By
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Fermin L. Arraiza-Navas
ACLU-PR
contact info
Lissette Duran
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Theresa J. Lee
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 4:55 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #95) filed by Appellants Comisión Estatal de Elecciones and Jessika D. Padilla Rivera. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Fee due 09/24/2024. 24-1822 (AVN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF