Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Referred: Eleanor G Tennyson
Case #: 1:24-cv-01023
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Inquis Medical, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin P.B. Johnson
contact info
Brian C. Cannon
contact info
Nathan Sun
contact info
Andrew Bramhall
contact info
Jennifer Siew
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Gavin Frisch
contact info
Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Inari Medical, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Edmond Kim
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Chandler Matz
contact info
Christina V. Rayburn
contact info
Sara M. Metzler
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
John C. Hueston
contact info
Karen Younkins
contact info

GPO Feb 27 2025
MEMORANDUM ORDER re 23 - Defendant's Motion to Stay is DENIED. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson on 2/27/2025. (lah)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
87 87 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 5:14 PM
REDACTED VERSION of73 Exhibit to a Document, by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
86 86 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 5:14 PM
REDACTED VERSION of72 Exhibit to a Document, by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
85 85 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 5:13 PM
REDACTED VERSION of71 Exhibit to a Document, by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
84 84 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 5:12 PM
REDACTED VERSION of70 Exhibit to a Document by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
83 83 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 5:11 PM
REDACTED VERSION of69 Letter by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
82 82 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/06 3:37 PM
ORAL ORDER re64 - The motion for teleconference to resolve discovery dispute is GRANTED. The transcript shall serve as the Court's ruling. ORDERED by Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson on 5/6/2025. (lah)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Conference Tue 05/06 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson - Discovery Conference held on 5/6/2025. (Court Reporter Stacy Ingram.) (lah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
81 81 discov Notice of Service Mon 05/05 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Inari Medical, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Inquis Medical, Inc. filed by Inari Medical, Inc..(Metzler, Sara)
Related: [-]
80 80 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 10:35 AM
ORDER re78 - The Motion for Exemption from Standing Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson on 5/5/2025. (lah)
Related: [-]
79 79 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 10:34 AM
ORDER re75 - The Motion for Exemption of Persons from the District of Delaware's May 17, 2024 Standing Order on Personal Devices is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson on 5/5/2025. (lah)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 05/05 9:12 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yegor Fursevich for Inari Medical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Mon 05/05 9:18 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I.78 main document and attachment replaced to reflect correct Standing Order date. (lah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
78 78 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 4:46 PM
MOTION for Exemption from Standing Order - filed by Inari Medical, Inc..Motions referred to Eleanor G. Tennyson.(Metzler, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
77 77 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Fri 05/02 3:48 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Yegor Fursevich. ( re76 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yegor Fursevich )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4677455).(Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
76 76 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 3:45 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yegor Fursevich - filed by Inari Medical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
75 75 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 12:52 PM
MOTION [INQUIS MEDICAL, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXEMPTION OF PERSONS FROM THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE'S MAY 17, 2024 STANDING ORDER ON PERSONAL DEVICES] - filed by Inquis Medical, Inc.. Motions referred to Eleanor G. Tennyson.(Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Fri 05/02 3:52 PM
SO ORDERED, re76 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yegor Fursevich, filed by Inari Medical, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/2/2025. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
74 74 order Oral Order Thu 05/01 11:43 AM
ORAL ORDER - Having reviewed the letter briefing associated with the pending discovery motion (D.I.66 &69 ) and in anticipation of the upcoming hearing on May 6, 2025, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall be fully prepared to discuss at the hearing all objections that it intends to assert in response to Plaintiff's document requests ( see D.I.66 at 1). ORDERED by Judge Eleanor G. Tennyson on 5/1/2025. (lah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
73 73 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/30 12:00 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re69 Letter [VOLUME 4 OF 4 (EXHIBIT 7) TO DEFENDANT INQUIS MEDICAL, INC.'S LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF INARI MEDICAL, INC.'S APRIL 25 LETTER] by Inquis Medical, Inc..(Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
72 72 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/30 11:56 AM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re69 Letter [VOLUME 3 OF 4 (EXHIBIT 6 - PART 2 OF 2) TO DEFENDANT INQUIS MEDICAL, INC.'S LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF INARI MEDICAL, INC.'S APRIL 25 LETTER] by Inquis Medical, Inc..(Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
71 71 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/30 11:53 AM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re69 Letter [VOLUME 2 OF 4 (EXHIBIT 6 - PART 1 OF 2) TO DEFENDANT INQUIS MEDICAL, INC.'S LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF INARI MEDICAL, INC.'S APRIL 25 LETTER] by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
70 70 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/30 11:50 AM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re69 Letter [VOLUME 1 OF 4 (EXHIBITS 1-5) TO DEFENDANT INQUIS MEDICAL, INC.'S LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF INARI MEDICAL, INC.'S APRIL 25 LETTER] by Inquis Medical, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
69 69 misc Letter Wed 04/30 11:48 AM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Eleanor G. Tennyson from Pilar G. Kraman regarding Response to Plaintiff Inari Medical, Inc.'s April 25 Letter - re66 Letter.(Kraman, Pilar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A