Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Lance M Africk
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:24-cv-02233
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1407 Products Liability
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Grayling V. Hill
Represented By
Joseph G. Glass
Duplass, Aplc
contact info
Ryan Mitchell Hall
Duplass Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Hilark Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph G. Glass
Duplass, Aplc
contact info
Ryan Mitchell Hall
Duplass Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Hilark-Lufkin Heavy Haul Trucks & Trailers, LLC
Represented By
Stanton E. Shuler, Jr.
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Louis P. Bonnaffons
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Robert Louis Bonnaffons
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Hilbilt Sales Corp.
Represented By
Joseph G. Glass
Duplass, Aplc
contact info
Ryan Mitchell Hall
Duplass Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Hilbilt-Lufkin Distribution, LLC
Represented By
Stanton E. Shuler, Jr.
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Louis P. Bonnaffons
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Robert Louis Bonnaffons
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Hill G3 Industries Inc.
Represented By
Joseph G. Glass
Duplass, Aplc
contact info
Ryan Mitchell Hall
Duplass Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Madden Gulf Coast LLC
Represented By
Christopher R. Handy
Bradley Murchison Kelly & Shea
contact info
Dwight C. Paulsen, III
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info

GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING 43 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/14/2025. (lb)
GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER AND REASONS: The Motion to Quash for a Protective Order (Rec. Doc. 62) filed by Defendants Hilark Industries, Inc., HilBilt Sales Corp., Hill G3 Industries, Inc., and Grayling V. Hill ("HilBilt Defendants") is GRANTED. Plaintiff Madden Gulf Coast LLC is not entitled to any discovery from the HilBilt Defendants' non-testifying expert, James I. Middleton, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/16/2025. (dw)
GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 75 Motion to Compel, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/22/2025. (lb)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
127 127 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Fri 05/23 4:44 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/23/2025. (lag)
Related: [-]
126 126 37 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Fri 05/23 1:21 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/23/2025. (lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
125 125 3 pgs order Order Set Hearings Tue 05/20 1:22 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2025 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
Related: [-]
124 124 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tue 05/20 10:29 AM
ORDER granting122 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Sara Peters Scurlock, Michael Wayne Maldonado, Loan H. Do for Grayling V. Hill. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/20/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
123 123 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 05/19 5:23 PM
ANSWER to106 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hilark Industries, Inc., Hilbilt Sales Corp., Grayling V. Hill, Hill G3 Industries Inc..(Hall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
122 122 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Mon 05/19 3:21 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Grayling V. Hill.(Hall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order