Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Stephanie L Haines
Case #: 3:24-cv-00211
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
Mary Lou Maierhofer
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR.
Defendant
JOHN DOES
Plaintiff
TROY MCKEE
Represented By
David R. Thompson
Thompson Law Offices, LLC
contact info
Brian D Jones
Thompson Law Offices, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ABBIE TATE
Terminated: 12/12/2024
Represented By
Mary Lou Maierhofer
Margolis Edelstein
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/18 10:57 AM
ORDER. In light of a Notice of Settlement, all pending deadlines are terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 3/18/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/04 4:05 PM
Judge Stephanie L. Haines presiding and Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge referred. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/21 11:58 AM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 3/12/2025, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/19/2025, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 3/19/2025, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 3/14/2025. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Parties will be directed to refer to the MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/21/2025. (mqe)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Fri 02/21 11:52 AM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (mqe)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Fri 02/21 10:57 AM
ORDER. A rule to show cause was issued on January 24, 2025 that required a response by January 31, 2025. Plaintiff, who has brought a claim against Defendant Dostal, failed to respond to the rule. Therefore, no later than February 25, 2025, Plaintiff shall show cause as to why a default should not be entered against Defendant Dostal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/21/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
22 22 order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/24 11:28 AM
ORDER issuing a rule to show cause why default should not be entered against Defendant Eric William Dostal, Jr. for failure to appear and respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint, or Third Amended Complaint. The Court notes that no extension of time has been filed as to Defendant Dostal. The deadline to show cause is January 31, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/24/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/30 7:05 AM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint, by BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Maierhofer, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/12 10:00 AM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOES, ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA answer due 12/26/2024 filed by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David) Modified text to correct answer due dates on 12/12/2024. (keh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 1:28 PM
ORDER granting18 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint THIRD by TROY MCKEE. Plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint by December 13, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/10/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (emk)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave to File Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 10:15 AM
Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint THIRD by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to File Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint
Monday, December 09, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Mon 12/09 10:49 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's16 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Court notes that in addition to removing Abbie Tate as a party, Plaintiff has revised his Monell claim (now Count II) against Blair County. Plaintiff's motion does not indicate whether Blair County was provided with and consented to the proposed Third Amended Complaint. Any renewed motion to amend must include this information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/9/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
16 16 motion Leave to File Amended Complaint Fri 12/06 12:02 PM
Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (THIRD) by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/26 10:45 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOES, ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR, ABBIE TATE BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA answer due 12/10/2024; JOHN DOES answer due 12/10/2024; ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR answer due 12/10/2024; ABBIE TATE answer due 12/10/2024, filed by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Fri 11/22 1:38 PM
ORDER granting13 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (SECOND) by TROY MCKEE. While Plaintiff failed to comply with the Court's order requiring Plaintiff to attach a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint, the Court assumes that the complaint Plaintiff seeks to file is the same version as the one that was previously filed and stricken. If that is the case, Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint by November 26, 2024 . If the proposed amendment is not identical to the stricken complaint, Plaintiff must renew its motion and attach a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/22/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (emk)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Amended Complaint Fri 11/22 10:13 AM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (SECOND) by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 order Order Thu 11/21 1:23 PM
ORDER striking Plaintiff's 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOES, ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR, ABBIE TATE BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. In accordance with FRCP 15(a)(1), Plaintiff has already amended his complaint once as a matter of course by filing a First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 9). Any further amendment is governed by Rule 15(a)(2), which requires either an order of court or the consent of all parties. As the consent of all parties cannot be achieved since not all parties have entered an appearance in this case, if Plaintiff wishes to further amend his complaint, he must first seek leave of Court pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2) by filing a motion to amend and attaching to the motion the proposed second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/21/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/12 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TROY MCKEE re9 Amended Complaint, (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/12 9:55 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOES, ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR, ABBIE TATE BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA answer due 11/26/2024; JOHN DOES answer due 11/26/2024; ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR answer due 11/26/2024; ABBIE TATE answer due 11/26/2024, filed by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
misc QC - Wrong event selected Wed 10/09 9:03 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
8 8 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Wed 10/09 9:02 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TROY MCKEE. ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR served on 9/17/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (keh)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/07 2:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Eric William Dostal, Jr. on 9/17/2024, filed by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
misc QC - Wrong event selected Fri 09/20 3:19 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re5 Summons/Returned Returned Executed, Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Waiver of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (keh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/20 3:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ABBIE TATE. BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024; ABBIE TATE waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (keh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 3:50 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ABBIE TATE. BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA served on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024; ABBIE TATE served on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA; ABBIE TATE. BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024; ABBIE TATE waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024. (Maierhofer, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lou Maierhofer on behalf of BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ABBIE TATE. (Maierhofer, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR, ABBIE TATE (keh)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Incorrect Nature of Suit (440/555) Thu 09/12 9:41 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Incorrect Nature of Suit (440) selected. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised in future that the correct Nature of Suit (555) should be selected. Please refer to the Civil Nature of Suit Code Descriptions found[LINK:here.] Clerk of Court corrected Nature of Suit on instant case. This message is for informational purposes only. (keh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Wed 09/11 3:59 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by TROY MCKEE (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 09/11 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOE(S), ERIC WILLIAM DOSTAL, JR, ABBIE TATE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8450744), filed by TROY MCKEE. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/11 3:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (keh)
Related: [-]