Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:24-cv-02144
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC
Represented By
Peter A. Milianti
Mcguire Woods, LLP
contact info
Cameron G. Kynes
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Terrance Edward Schmidt
Represented By
Terrance E. Schmidt
Terrance E. Schmidt, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Luann Padron
Represented By
George G. Triantis
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/15 3:05 PM
AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC.(Milianti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 01/13 6:42 PM
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/13/2025. (Wilson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
21 21 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 01/08 11:31 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend16 Answer to Complaint by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC.(Milianti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 12/13 4:13 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2025. Discovery due by 9/23/2025 Dispositive motions due by 10/23/2025 Pretrial statement due by 2/12/2026 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/25/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/25/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2026 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 9 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti Jury Trial set for 3/9/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 9 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/15/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 12/13/2024. (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
19 19 misc Case Management Report Tue 11/12 11:26 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Milianti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 5:54 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter A. Milianti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/7/2024. (Wilson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 3:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Peter A. Milianti to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22699744 for $150 by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC. (Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 3:31 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC.(Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 10/31 4:28 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC. Related case(s): No (Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re12 Civil Action Order by Luann Padron. (Edelman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 10/22 2:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC.. (Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
12 12 order Civil Action Order Mon 10/21 1:47 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/21/2024. (JS)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 10/21 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/21 9:14 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC answer or response due 11/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/18/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 10/02 10:23 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC. (Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of appearance Wed 09/25 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron G. Kynes on behalf of Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC (Kynes, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 service Summons returned executed Tue 09/17 7:40 AM
RETURN of service executed on 9 13-2024 by Luann Padron as to Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC. (Edelman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Thu 09/12 4:05 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC. (LNR)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 09/12 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Marc Reed Edelman on behalf of Luann Padron. Lead Counsel: Marc R. Edelman. (Edelman, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 09/12 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 order Standing Order Fri 09/13 10:00 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/11/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/11 3:25 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-2144-JLB-TGW. (ARL)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/11 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Schneider Enterprise Resources, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22506395) filed by Luann Padron.(Triantis, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons