Florida Northern District Court
Judge:T Kent Wetherell II
Referred: Zachary C Bolitho
Case #: 3:24-cv-00429
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
JESSE HERNANDEZ
Represented By
GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS
Coppins Monroe Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT WAGNER
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
ERIC AIDEN
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
PIERRE BATISTE
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1-50
Defendant
JAVIER REYNA
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
JERALD RHEINHARDT
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
ELIZABETH ROBERTS
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
TRENT ZELLARS
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
MARQUIS JACKSON
Represented By
DEWITT M LACY
Burris Nisenbaum Curry & Lacy - Beverly Hills Ca
contact info
LENA PEARL ANDREWS
Burris Nisenbaum Curry & Lacy - Beverly Hills Ca
contact info
JULIA N QUESADA
Burris Nisenbaum Curry & Lacy - Beverly Hills Ca
contact info
MUTAQEE NAIM AKBAR
Mutaqee Akbar Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
COUNTY OF OKALOOSA
Terminated: 11/20/2024
Represented By
MATTHEW REED SHAUD
Nabors Giblin & Nickerson Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
LISA BARCLAY FOUNTAIN
Nabors Giblin & Nickerson Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Terminated: 12/05/2024
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
81 81 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/15 9:18 AM
ORDER re 80 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. The notice is treated as a motion to withdraw and is GRANTED. Attorney Lena P. Andrews has no further obligation to represent Plaintiff in this case, and the Clerk shall terminate Ms. Andrews as counsel of record in CM/ECF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 05/15/2025. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
80 80 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 05/14 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by MARQUIS JACKSON (LACY, DEWITT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
79 79 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 05/13 4:27 PM
ORDER. Within seven days of this Order, counsel for the parties must hold a teleconference to resolve any outstanding issues and to get signed copies of releases for Publix and the Florida Department of Health. The Court GRANTS Defendants motion (Doc. 72 ) to the extent that the case deadlines are modified as follows: a. Discovery completion deadline: July 15, 2025, b. Mediation deadline: July 29, 2025, Dispositive motions/Daubert motions deadline: August 19, 2025, d. Defendants expert disclosure deadline: June 6, 2025. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 05/13/2025. (alb)
Related: [-]
78 78 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/13 2:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2025 re72 MOTION to Extend Time filed by PIERRE BATISTE, JERALD RHEINHARDT, ELIZABETH ROBERTS, ERIC AIDEN. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter CD.) (sdw)
Related: [-]
77 77 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/13 12:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re72 MOTION to Extend Time filed by MARQUIS JACKSON. (LACY, DEWITT)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/13 4:31 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings re79 Order. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/19/2025 . Discovery due by 7/15/2025 . Mediation to take place by 7/29/2025 . Expert Disclosure Deadline - by 6/6/2025 . (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/16 7:35 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings RE79 ORDER. Mediation Report due by 8/5/2025 . (alb)
Related: [-]