New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00567
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 12, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
DIEGO RAMOS (1)
Represented By
JAMES S. FRIEDMAN
James S Friedman, LLC
contact info
SHISHENE JING
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SAM THYPIN-BERMEO
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 4:05 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
Arrest of DIEGO RAMOS (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to DIEGO RAMOS (1). (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to DIEGO RAMOS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/29/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
Case unsealed as to DIEGO RAMOS (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to DIEGO RAMOS held on 11/30/2022, CJA 23 Affidavit submitted reviewed and approved: Bond Hearing as to DIEGO RAMOS held on 11/30/2022, Bail Denied on conditions proposed, Deft. remanded to US Marshal pending further proceedings; Initial Appearance as to DIEGO RAMOS held on 11/30/2022, Penalties placed on record, Brady Order read into record and filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to DIEGO RAMOS. SHISHENE JING, Esq. for DIEGO RAMOS appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to DIEGO RAMOS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by DIEGO RAMOS (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 12/1/2022 until 1/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/1/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
11 11 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JAMES S. FRIEDMAN for DIEGO RAMOS added. Attorney SHISHENE JING terminated. (FRIEDMAN, JAMES) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
12 12 First MOTION for Release from Custody by DIEGO RAMOS.(FRIEDMAN, JAMES) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 1/24/2023 until 3/19/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/24/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
13 13 TEXT ORDER as to DIEGO RAMOS re12 First MOTION for Release from Custody filed by DIEGO RAMOS Govt's opposition due by 2/2/2023, Motion set for 2/9/2023 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/26/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
15 15 Transcript of Initial Appearance and Bail Hearing as to DIEGO RAMOS held on November 30, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber only. (adc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
16 16 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to DIEGO RAMOS re12 First MOTION for Release from Custody (CHUNG, JENNY) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, February 09, 2023
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Deft. present,Motion Hearing or Bond as to DIEGO RAMOS held on 2/9/2023 re12 First MOTION for Release from Custody ,arguments heard from counsel, ruling placed on record Bail DENIED. Deft. to remain in US Marshal custody pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
18 18 Detention ORDER denying12 Motion for Release from Custody as to DIEGO RAMOS (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/9/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 3/20/2023 until 5/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/20/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 4/10/2024 until 5/27/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/10/2024. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
21 21 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SAM THYPIN-BERMEO for USA added. Attorney JENNY CHUNG terminated. (THYPIN-BERMEO, SAM) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 5/24/2024 until 6/22/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/24/2024. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
23 23 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DIEGO RAMOS Time excluded from 7/2/2024 until 9/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/2/2024. (spc) [2:22-mj-11359-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
Magistrate Courtroom Deputy notified of successful merge on 9/10/2024 (jmh)
Related: [-]
24 24 INFORMATION as to DIEGO RAMOS (1) count 1. (jmh)
Related: [-]
25 25 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by DIEGO RAMOS (jmh)
Related: [-]
26 26 Minute Entry for proceeding held before Judge Georgette Castner: Plea Agreement Hearing as to Diego Ramos held on 9/10/2024; Guilty Plea entered as to Count 1 of the Information; Sentencing set for February 11, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Georgette Castner; Defendant Remanded. (Court Reporter Kimberly Wilson (609-815-2751). (jmh) (Entered: 09/10/2024)
Related: [-]
27 27 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to DIEGO RAMOS. (jmh)
Related: [-]
28 28 PLEA AGREEMENT as to DIEGO RAMOS (jmh)
Related: [-]