New York Southern District Court
Judge:Victor Marrero
Case #: 1:24-cv-06866
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1346bc Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
EF Hutton LLC
Plaintiff
Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation
Represented By
Aaron Harold Pierce
Pierce & Kwok LLP
contact info
Victor M. Feraru
Law Office Of Victor Feraru
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
26 26 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/19 12:16 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:25 Letter filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Court hereby approves the above stipulated briefing schedule. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the pending letter motion at Dkt. No. 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/19/2025) (Motions due by 6/13/2025. Replies due by 7/28/2025. Responses due by 7/14/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Wed 05/14 2:46 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Aaron H. Pierce dated May 14, 2025 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Pierce, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 6:02 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, the Court directs Squarex and EF Hutton to advise whether they consent for the Court to deem the pre- motion letters to constitute a fully briefed motion to dismiss and rule on the basis of those letters, or whether the parties request supplemental or full briefing. If Squarex and EF Hutton request supplemental or full briefing, they shall submit a proposed briefing schedule within one (1) week of the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/12/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
23 23 motion Conference Fri 05/09 5:27 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Defendant dated May 9, 2025. Document filed by EF Hutton LLC..(Lee, Fawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Mon 05/05 5:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Aaron H. Pierce dated May 5, 2025 re: Motion to Dismiss Conferral Letter. Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Pierce, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Brian Baum on behalf of EF Hutton LLC..(Baum, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Fri 04/25 1:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Defendant dated April 25,2025 re: Motion to Dismiss Conferral Letter. Document filed by EF Hutton LLC..(Lee, Fawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A February 8, 2022 Letter
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/04 11:05 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT EF HUTTON LLC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the respective parties, as follows: 1. Defendant shall have until April 28, 2025 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. This is Defendants first extension request and Plaintiff consents to the request. 2. Defendant agrees that the Summons and Complaint were properly served, and Defendant agrees not to raise an affirmative defense to, or otherwise challenge, the sufficiency of service of process. 3. This Stipulation and Order shall not be modified or amended except by written agreement executed by the Parties hereto. 4. The Parties agree that this Court shall retain jurisdiction to hear and determine any disputes relating to this Stipulation and Order and the Complaint. 5. This Stipulation and Order may be executed by counterpart, originals, electronic copies or facsimiles, and each such counterpart shall be deemed an original instrument, but all such counterparts together shall constitute one agreement. SO ORDERED. EF Hutton LLC answer due 4/28/2025., Motions terminated:18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . filed by EF Hutton LLC. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/4/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/02 2:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by EF Hutton LLC..(Lee, Fawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 8:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fawn Mei Lee on behalf of EF Hutton LLC..(Lee, Fawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 03/24 10:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. EF Hutton LLC served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service was accepted by David W. Boral. Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Pierce, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 service Amended Summons Issued Wed 03/05 4:13 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to EF Hutton LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 03/04 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC, re:12 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Pierce, Aaron)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Harold Pierce on behalf of Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Pierce, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/21 10:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint, against EF Hutton LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation. Related document:1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint,..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/21 10:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/19 3:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 10 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) Modified on 9/19/2024 (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Wed 09/18 1:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC, re:5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Squarex Pharmaceutical Corporation..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/18 1:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/18 1:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EF Hutton LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/12 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 09/12 10:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $60,000,000,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 09/12 10:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Victor M. Feraru. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION; EF HUTTON LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 09/12 10:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 09/12 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 09/12 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 09/12 10:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/12 10:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Victor M. Feraru to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/11 5:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC, re:5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC, re:5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/11 5:06 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC. Related document:1 Complaint..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/11 3:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/11 3:17 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/11 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/11 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against EF HUTTON LLC, a division of BENCHMARK INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29879002)Document filed by SQUAREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, formerly known as SQUAREX LLC..(Feraru, Victor)
Related: [-]