Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Steven C Seeger
Case #: 1:24-cv-08295
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Grace Smith
Defendant
Jacob Clayton
Represented By
Fuad Rabi Sulayman
Tamari Law Group, LLC
contact info
Helam Gebremariam
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Sharonmoyee Goswami
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Adisa Krupalija
Tamari Law Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sage Intel, Inc.
Represented By
Fuad Rabi Sulayman
Tamari Law Group, LLC
contact info
Helam Gebremariam
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Sharonmoyee Goswami
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Adisa Krupalija
Tamari Law Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Weeks
Plaintiff
Laconic Development LLC
Represented By
Robert Burkart Ellis
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kristin Rose
contact info
Plaintiff
Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Burkart Ellis
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kristin Rose
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 1:26 AM CST
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (lcd, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lcd, )
Related: [-]
1 1 58 pgs COMPLAINT -REDACTED- filed by Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc., Laconic Development LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22465416.(Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 3 pgs Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 2 pgs Exhibit 33
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. SEALED COMPLAINT AND(Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2-SEALED,
Att: 2 Exhibit 15-SEALED,
Att: 3 Exhibit 20-SEALED,
Att: 4 Exhibit 24-SEALED
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. by Robert Burkart Ellis (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. to seal PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS LACONIC INFRASTRUCTURE PARTNERS INC. AND LACONIC DEVELOPMENT LLC (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. for temporary restraining order OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE , MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM by Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order,, motion for preliminary injunction,7 -REDACTED(Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
9 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. SEALED VERSION OF ECF DKT.8- LACONIC'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION(Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B-SEALED
10 10 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. for temporary restraining order OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. for preliminary injunction 7 AFFIDAVIT OF CHRISTOPHER JOHN LANE, K.C. and EXHIBITS (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. to seal PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNDER SEAL-Dkt. 9 (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 CERTIFICATION OF ROBERT B. ELLIS, P.C. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65(b)(1)(B) by Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laconic Development LLC, Laconic Infrastructure Partners, Inc. for leave to file excess pages LACONIC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN EXCESS OF FIFTEEN PAGES (Ellis, Robert)
Related: [-]