Wyoming District Court
Judge:Alan B Johnson
Referred: Scott P Klosterman
Case #: 2:24-cv-00180
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 2:48 AM MDT
Defendant
Channel Point Employee Services LLC
5301 Headquarters Drive
Plano, TX 75024
Represented By
David L Zwisler
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marissa Vargas
Represented By
Donna D Domonkos
Domonkos Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 order Dismissing Case Fri 11/15 9:32 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Case closed. (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/14 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Marissa Vargaspursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Domonkos, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/31 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Channel Point Employee Services LLC. Dismissal pleading due by 11/27/2024. (Zwisler, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Zwisler on behalf of Channel Point Employee Services LLC (Zwisler, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure of Corporations Thu 10/17 9:44 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Channel Point Employee Services LLC identifying Other Affiliate Channel Point Hospitality, LLC, Other Affiliate Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Other Affiliate Aimbridge Hospitality Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Aimbridge Parent, Inc. for Channel Point Employee Services LLC.. (Zwisler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive Tue 10/15 3:57 PM
ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Scott P Klosterman granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. Defendants have up to and including 10/31/24 to answer or otherwise respond to1 Plaintiffs Complaint. (Court Staff, sal)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) Tue 10/15 12:20 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Scott P Klosterman. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Defendant Channel Point Employee Services LLC.(Zwisler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 09/11 4:20 PM
Summons Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed Wed 09/11 4:13 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson with a referral to Magistrate Judge Scott P. Klosterman. (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 09/11 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Channel Point Employee Services LLC (Filing fee $405 Receipt Number AWYDC-2494250), filed by Marissa Vargas. (Domonkos, Donna) Modified to add receipt info on 9/11/2024 (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons