California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:24-cv-01943
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 1:24 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Beast Bites Supplements Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan W. Thomas
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Daniel Enrique Gaitan
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Monster Energy Company
Represented By
Brandon Dean Hupka
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear, LLP
contact info
Matthew Scott Bellinger
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Steven J Nataupsky
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Lynda J Zadra-Symes
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Defendant
Beast Bites Supplements Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan W. Thomas
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Daniel Enrique Gaitan
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monster Energy Company
Represented By
Brandon Dean Hupka
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear, LLP
contact info
Matthew Scott Bellinger
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Steven J Nataupsky
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Lynda J Zadra-Symes
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/04 3:18 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Anne Hwang. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/16/2025 is hereby VACATED. The Trial and Final Pretrial Conference Dates: Trial set for 6/23/2026 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference [L.R. 16], Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 6/3/2026 at 1:30 PM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties: 5/28/2025. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 11/7/2011. Last Date to Hear Motions: 3/11/2026. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 4/29/2026. Motions in Limine: 5/6/2026. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 5/20/2026. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 04/01 4:33 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 Days, filed by Counter Defendant Monster Energy Company, Plaintiff Monster Energy Company..(Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 20, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/20 1:09 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley Morales counsel for Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, Counter Defendant Monster Energy Company. Adding Ashley C. Morales as counsel of record for Monster Energy Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Counter-defendant Monster Energy Company. (Attorney Ashley Morales added to party Monster Energy Company(pty:pla), Attorney Ashley Morales added to party Monster Energy Company(pty:cd))(Morales, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
27 27 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/05 10:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Anne Hwang: granting26 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Thoma APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc., Counter Claimant Beast Bites Supplements Inc., designating Daniel E. Gaitan as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 02/05 9:35 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc., Counter Claimant Beast Bites Supplements Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39045254) filed by defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc.. (Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 01/29 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Scott Bellinger counsel for Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, Counter Defendant Monster Energy Company. Brandon Dean Hupka is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Monster Energy Company. (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 01/29 2:23 PM
Monster Energy Company's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, Counterclaim,,21 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Monster Energy Company.(Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
23 23 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 01/13 3:21 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by District Judge Anne Hwang. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 4/16/2025 at 01:30 PM. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 01/08 3:10 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES (jp)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Wed 01/08 2:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Monster Energy Company filed by Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc..(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20
Friday, December 06, 2024
20 20 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 12/09 11:49 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#191) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Anne Hwang, this case is transferred from Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to the calendar of Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:24-cv-01943-AH (SHKx). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/03 1:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS [NOTE CHANGES BY COURT] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended from December 9, 2024 to January 8, 2025. The Court is not inclined to grant further extensions. RE: Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint18 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 3 pgs stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/02 9:24 AM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Beast Bites Supplements Inc..(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/05 11:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended from November 9, 2024 to December 9, 2024. RE: Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint16 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
16 16 3 pgs stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/01 11:24 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc..(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 10/10 3:41 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc..(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 10/10 3:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption shall indicate how many previous extensions requested. See Judge Kato's Standing Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 10/09 6:58 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Beast Bites Supplements Inc. answer now due 11/9/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc..(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 10/09 6:53 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Enrique Gaitan counsel for Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc.. Adding Daniel Gaitan as counsel of record for Beast Bites Supplements Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc.. (Attorney Daniel Enrique Gaitan added to party Beast Bites Supplements Inc.(pty:dft))(Gaitan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 09/26 10:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monster Energy Company, upon Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc. served on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chloe Lowe, Registered Agent for Defendant Beast Bites Supplements, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/13 11:46 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/12 8:40 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Beast Bites Supplements Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 09/12 8:33 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/12 8:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/12 8:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Wed 09/11 6:11 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,. (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 09/11 6:09 PM
Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,, identifying Monster Beverage Corporation. (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 09/11 6:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,. (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 09/11 6:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,. (Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/11 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38196689 - Fee: $405, filed by PLAINTIFF MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,. (Attorney Matthew Scott Bellinger added to party MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY,(pty:pla))(Bellinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 77 pgs Exhibit 1-15