Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles M Walker
Case #: 3:24-bk-03495
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
FAIR OFFER CASH NOW, INC.
1308 CARL ADAMS DRIVE SUITE 300
Murfreesboro, TN 37129
Represented By
Jay Lefkovitz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
179 179 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/03 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 175 Order on Motion to Allow Late Filed Claim(s) - BK Order
178 178 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/03 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 174 Compensation - Order
Thursday, May 01, 2025
177 177 misc Prehearing Statement Thu 05/01 9:07 PM
Prehearing Statement on Trustmark National Bank's Motion for Relief . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor FAIR OFFER CASH NOW, INC. Related [+]. (Lefkovitz, Jay)
Related: [-] 145
176 176 misc Prehearing Statement Thu 05/01 5:22 PM
Prehearing Statement of Trustmark National Bank . Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Trustmark National Bank Related [+]. (Lavell, Paul)
Related: [-] 145 ,147
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Note, Mortgage & Deed
Att: 2 Exhibit " B" Warranty Deed
175 175 order Allow Late Filed Claim(s) - BK Order Thu 05/01 2:31 PM
Order Granting Motion to Allow Late Filed Claim(s) 26 of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Charles M. Walker. (rww)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #140
174 174 order Compensation - Order Thu 05/01 1:40 PM
Amended Order Granting Motion for Compensation (Third Interim Motion for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Attorney for Debtor) for Jay Lefkovitz, fees awarded: $14526.00, expenses awarded: $16.00. Related [+] ( Related Doc#:173 ). BY THE COURT: Judge Charles M. Walker. (rww)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #104
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
173 173 order Rejected Order - For Chambers Use Only Wed 04/30 12:08 PM
Order Rejected: Related [+]. The uploaded Order will not be signed and entered for the reason stated in the referenced document. Signed on 4/30/2025. (lwj)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:104
172 172 order Rejected Order - For Chambers Use Only Wed 04/30 12:04 PM
Order Rejected: Related [+]. The uploaded Order will not be signed and entered for the reason stated in the referenced document. Signed on 4/30/2025. (lwj)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:140
Saturday, April 26, 2025
171 171 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/26 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 168 Order on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) - BK Order
170 170 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/26 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 167 Order on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) - BK Order
169 169 motion Compensation - Motion Sat 04/26 4:17 PM
Motion for Compensation of Law Firm of Lefkovitz & Lefkovitz, PLLC for Jay Lefkovitz, Attorney, Period: 3/2/2025 to 4/26/2025, Fee: $29,700, Expenses: $54. If timely response hearing will be held on 6/25/2025 at 11:00 AM, Courtroom 2 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 5/19/2025. Certificate of Service mailed on 4 28-2025 Filed on the behalf of: Attorney Jay Lefkovitz. (Lefkovitz, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Timesheet
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Order
Att: 3 Supplement Mailing Matrix