Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00747
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Grenion GmbH
Plaintiff
Zugara, Inc.
Represented By
James Francis McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Danielle De La Paz
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Carey Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 01/31 1:50 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (slo)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/31 1:48 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending claims and causes of action in the abovecaptioned cases are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending requests for relief in the above-captioned cases not explicitly granted herein are DENIED AS MOOT. Each party is to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 10:56 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER- The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:24-cv-00743. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/03 11:19 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Complaint (up to and including January 15, 2025) Grenion GmbH answer due 1/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2:24cv747 (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/27 8:27 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Complaint (up to and including January 15, 2025) by Zugara, Inc..(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 10/29 12:51 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zugara, Inc..(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 10/29 1:54 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Grenion GmbH to 12/6/2024. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 7:40 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Grenion GmbH. (CH)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/12 7:36 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (CH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 09/12 7:37 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
8 8 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 9:24 AM
CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Grenion GmbH, filed by Zugara, Inc..(CH) (CH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/12/2024) Civil Cover Sheet
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/11 10:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle De La Paz on behalf of Zugara, Inc. (De La Paz, Danielle)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/11 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of Zugara, Inc. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/11 10:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of Zugara, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 09/11 10:26 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 09/11 10:23 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Zugara, Inc. (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/11 10:21 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Grenion GmbH ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10354190.), filed by Zugara, Inc..(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) Proposed Summons