Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00984
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 9:34 PM HST
Defendant
Alexander Cain Poplin (1)
Represented By
Salina M. Kanai
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rebecca Ann Perlmutter
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:26 PM HST
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of Alexander Cain Poplin. (jni)
Related: [-]
1 1 DECLARATION OF KARA MIYAKE - by USA from the District of Columbia, 1:24-mj-00247 (DDC) as to Alexander Cain Poplin. (jni) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2024, NEF regenerated to all counsel. #3 (Redacted) Criminal Complaint) (jni).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arrest Warrant (page 1),
Att: 2 Arrest Warrant (page 2)
2 2 EO: as to Alexander Cain Poplin - A Rule 5 (OUT) Initial Appearance is set for 9/11/2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Attorney Salina Kanai and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are provisionally appointed pending submission of Defendant's financial affidavit.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (ab)
Related: [-]