California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02305
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 12, 2024 1:01 AM PDT
Defendant
In The Matter Of The Extradition of Jesus Oliver Piceno Villegas (1)
Represented By
Robert Carriedo
Law Offices Of Robert Carriedo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Daniel F. Casillas
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 3:13 AM PDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT (T/W WARRANT) as to In The Matter Of The Extradition of Jesus Oliver Piceno Villegas (1).(mef) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/16/2024 to unseal) (jpp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by In The Matter Of The Extradition of Jesus Oliver Piceno Villegas. (mef)Attorney U S Attorney CR added to party In The Matter Of The Extradition of Jesus Oliver Piceno Villegas(pty:dft)
Related: [-]