California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:24-cv-06347
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 1:25 AM PST
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Attorney's Office Northern District of California
450 Golden Gate Ave.
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
The Center for Investigative Reporting
Center for Investigative Reporting 1400 65th St., Suite 200
Emeryville, CA 94608
Represented By
Thomas R. Burke
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Sarah E Burns
Davis Wright Tremaine
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 09/26 9:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/25 6:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Burke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/19 11:02 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/19 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/11 9:47 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2024. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Justice. Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting.(Burke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19829058.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting.(Burke, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]