Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-90468

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:24-bk-90503
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million

Debtor
Forte Media Solutions, LLC
4800 140th Ave N Ste 101
Clearwater, FL 33762-3874
Represented By
James A. Keefe
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
4 4 court No Creditor Mailing List Tue 09/17 6:34 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (mmm4)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 14, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Thursday, September 12, 2024
2 2 order Joint Administration Thu 09/12 6:27 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 24-90468 Signed on 9/12/2024 (tjl4)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 09/12 12:06 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Forte Media Solutions, LLC. (Keefe, James)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 09/12 6:28 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 24-90468 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (tjl4)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 09/12 12:16 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-90503 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B25562041. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]