Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04940
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
David Frantz
Represented By
Mitchell Theodore
Cory Watson PC
contact info
Jon Collins Conlin
Cory Watson Attorneys
contact info
Joel Caldwell
Cory Watson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 09/12 9:57 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 09/11/2024), Frantz v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04940-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of Alaska (wmil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11984627.), filed by David Frantz. Service due by 12/10/2024(wmil)
Related: [-]