Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Case #: 2:24-cv-00670
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Defendant
Bartlett S.
Defendant
Jackson B.
Defendant
Jennifer L Valencia
Defendant
Layne Workman
Defendant
Parker M.
Defendant
Randall Rolen
Defendant
Ron Fujino
Defendant
Wallace Clermont Gedeon
Defendant
Zachary Cole Fratto
Notice Party
Correction Section (FYI)
Notice Party
Prisoner Litigation Unit
Plaintiff
Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young

GPO Jan 28 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION & DISMISSAL ORDER: For Plaintiff's failure to follow the Court's orders and prosecute this case, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/28/25. (dle)

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 order Judgment Tue 01/28 9:26 AM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/28/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Memorandum Decision Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/28 9:23 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION & DISMISSAL ORDER: For Plaintiff's failure to follow the Court's orders and prosecute this case, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/28/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
10 10 order Order Thu 12/26 8:43 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: On November 1, 2024, based on Plaintiff's Authorization, Consent and Declaration, and Financial Certificate, Plaintiff authorized his inmate-accounting office to within thirty days remit Plaintiff's $0.34 initial partial filing fee (IPFF). (ECF Nos. 5-6, 8.) Plaintiff was warned that failure to file the IPFF would "result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice." (ECF No. 8.) The IPFF has not been received yet, and it is ultimately Plaintiffs responsibility to ensure that it is received by the Court. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days in which to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the IPFF. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/26/2024. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Tue 11/19 4:29 PM
Mail sent to Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young re docket entry 8 Returned as Undeliverable/Addressee Unknown. Envelope filed in case 2:24cv437 showed filer to be at Davis County Jail, but she did not appear on their online roster. Call to that jail resulted in them finding paperwork showing she had been transferred to Salt Lake Metro Jail. Address has been updated and DTO resent to new address. (alt)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/01 2:47 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, and the financial certificate provided from the correctional institution, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to remit the initial partial filing fee (IPFF) of $0.34 within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. (ECF Nos. 5-6.) Plaintiff is ultimately responsible to ensure the IPFF is timely received by the Court. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/1/2024. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
7 7 misc Modification of Docket Tue 10/22 11:36 AM
Modification of Docket: No.5 Error: Image was not attached to docket entry. Correction: Image has been attached to docket entry. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/08 4:25 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 misc Financial Certificate Tue 10/08 4:32 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young received from Correctional Institution. Initial Partial Filing Fee $.34.(kpf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, September 16, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/16 2:02 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Still, the Motion is incomplete or not compliant with the court's requirements. The Motion is therefore only conditionally granted. The Plaintiff should carefully review the attached standard Notice of Deficiency and must complete and return the attached motion form. If the required inmate account statement has not already been filed it must be filed within 30 days. If the correctly completed motion and account statement are not received within 30 days the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/16/2024.(kpf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Motion Form
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/16 1:22 PM
ENTRY ERROR DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/16/2024. No attached document. (kpf) Modified to strike image on 9/16/2024 (kpf)
Related: [-]
misc Modification of Docket Mon 09/16 1:35 PM
Modification of Docket: re 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Wrong docket text order attached to motion. Correction: The order will be stricken. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/12 12:04 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young. (sg)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 09/11/2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Court) Thu 09/12 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Jackson B., Zachary Cole Fratto, Ron Fujino, Wallace Clermont Gedeon, Parker M., Randall Rolen, Bartlett S., Jennifer L Valencia, Layne Workman (Originally received by the court on 09/11/2024). (Fee Status: PENDING IFP) filed by Finesse Nikkol Smith-Young. Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (sg) (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summonses
Att: 3 (9/12/2024) Envelope