Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00503
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Summit Home Healthcare, LLC
4600 McAuley Place, Suite 150
Cincinnati, OH 45242
Represented By
Felix John Gora
contact info
Edward James McHale
Rendigs, Fry, Kiely & Dennis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Adams
1440 Twin Spires Dr.
Batavia, OH 45103
Represented By
Brian Joseph Butler
Mezibov Butler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 02/19 9:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER (1) Required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1): February 21, 2025. (2) Settlement demand by Plaintiff upon Defendant to be made by: February 28, 2025. (3) Response to settlement demand due by: March 28, 2025. (4) Deadline for motions directed to pleadings: March 21, 2025. (5) Deadline for motions to amend pleadings and/or add parties: March 21, 2025. (6) Disclosure of lay witnesses: May 30, 2025. (7) Plaintiff's expert report(s) and designation(s): August 1, 2025. (8) Defendant's expert designation(s): September 2, 2025. (9) Rebuttal expert report(s) and designation(s): October 3, 2025. (10) Deadline for discovery: November 7, 2025. (11) Telephone status conference to discuss settlement negotiations and alternative dispute resolution mechanisms: November 13, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. (12) Dispositive motion deadline: December 12, 2025. (13) Final Pretrial Conference: To be determined. (14) Jury Trial: To be determined. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 2/19/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/19 2:23 PM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/19/2025. Attorney Appearances: Attorney Brian Butler appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff; Attorneys Edward McHale and Felix Gora appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Case matters discussed. End of Discovery Telephone Conference is set for 11/13/2025 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will issue a separate notice of hearing. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/07 9:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/5/2025. Attorney Appearances: Attorney Brian Butler was unable to appear; Attorneys Edward McHale and Felix Gora appeared on behalf of the Defendant. This matter will be reset for 2/19/2025 at 3:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) (kmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 order Related Case Memorandum Mon 02/03 1:56 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:24-cv-627 ARE related. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 2/3/25. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 01/29 1:50 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendant Summit Home Healthcare, LLC. (McHale, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/28 1:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Summit Home Healthcare, LLC. (McHale, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 order Related Case Memorandum Tue 11/26 2:49 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:24-cv-503, 1:24-cv-645 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/26/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 3:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Summit Home Healthcare, LLC. (Gora, Felix)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 3:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Summit Home Healthcare, LLC on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 09/16 9:43 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Summit Home Healthcare, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10164365), filed by Rebecca Adams. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue