Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:24-cv-01085
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 3:43 AM CDT
Cross Claimant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
S. Loyd Neal, III
The Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
S. Loyd Neal, III
The Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
S. Loyd Neal, III
The Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Debra Bradberry
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford & Bergner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Andrew F. MacRae
Macrae Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
misc Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer Thu 05/08 11:53 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District of Texas as case number 4:25-cv-02055. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Tue 05/06 2:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion to Change Venue. It is Ordered that the case is Transferred to the Houston Division of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
notice Notice Mon 05/05 4:53 PM
Notice: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt.12 ), the Court will realign the remaining parties at a later date. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Parties Mon 05/05 4:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Dearborn Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 motion Change Venue Mon 04/21 1:46 PM
MOTION to Change Venue by Consent of the Parties by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Noel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 03/07 2:10 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Dearborn Life Insurance Company . (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 notice Notice Thu 02/27 8:47 AM
Receipt of Deposit ($424,000.00); re:12 Agreed Interpleader Orders by Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Tue 02/18 9:30 AM
STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Subpoena and Motion to Quash by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Noel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Quash Tue 02/18 4:05 PM
Text Order MOOTING15 Dr. Balkees Abderrahman's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order in light of16 Stipulation for Withdrawal of Subpoena and Motion to Quash entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jglc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Protective Order Wed 02/12 8:18 PM
Proposed Protective Order by Balkees Abderrahman. (Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Quash Wed 02/12 6:41 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Balkees Abderrahman.(Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
14 14 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Wed 02/12 3:40 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Agreed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Balkees Abderrahman, Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 12:35 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Mon 01/27 3:21 PM
AGREED INTERPLEADER ORDERS. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
11 11 motion Deposit Funds Wed 01/15 10:33 AM
Agreed MOTION to Deposit Funds by Dearborn Life Insurance Company.(MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 12/17 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Bradberry on behalf of Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner (Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 12/02 7:01 PM
ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against Balkees Abderrahman by Helen M.Y. Turner, Alexandra K.L. Noel.(Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 11:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Debra Bradberry added to party Alexandra K.L. Noel(pty:dft), Attorney Debra Bradberry added to party Helen M.Y. Turner(pty:dft) by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner.(Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 11/11 11:47 AM
Defendant Balkees Abderrahman's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Request for Declaratory Judgment . Attorney S. Loyd Neal, III added to party Balkees Abderrahman(pty:dft), CROSSCLAIM against Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner by Balkees Abderrahman.(Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/14 9:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Helen M.Y. Turner. Waiver sent on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/14 9:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Alexandra K.L. Noel. Waiver sent on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 12:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Balkees Abderrahman. Waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/01 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Balkees Abderrahman. (dm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/01 4:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT in Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19221440). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas.(MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/13 4:16 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 09/13 4:16 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]