Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01446
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Seek Limited
Represented By
Selby P Brown
Summit Law Group
contact info
Laura Popp-Rosenberg
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu
contact info
Courtney B. Shier
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu
contact info
Molly J Gibbons
Summit Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
ZipStorm Inc
Represented By
Katie Christensen
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Caleb Bacos
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
William C Rava
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
26 26 respm Declaration Thu 04/03 5:38 PM
Second DECLARATION of Brooke Quinn in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Seek Limited re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2) (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/03 5:31 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Seek Limited, TO RESPONSE to17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2) (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Fri 03/28 10:32 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
23 23 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 03/28 10:31 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 respm Declaration Thu 03/27 3:52 PM
DECLARATION of William C. Rava filed by Plaintiff ZipStorm Inc re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2)(Rava, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G
21 21 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/27 3:51 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff ZipStorm Inc, to17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2) . (Rava, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 03/11 12:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 5:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Seek Limited. (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Declaration Thu 03/06 5:24 PM
DECLARATION of Brooke Quinn filed by Defendant Seek Limited re17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2) (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 5:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and (2) , filed by Defendant Seek Limited. Noting Date 4/3/2025, (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/06 11:56 AM
ORDER granting12 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties signed by Judge David W. Christel. Answer due 3/6/2025. (KEB)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 10:46 AM
ORDER re14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorneys Courtney B. Shier, and Laura Popp-Rosenberg for Defendant Seek Limited, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
14 14 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 4:02 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laura Popp-Rosenberg FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Seek Limited (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8869203 (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 4:00 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Courtney Shier FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Seek Limited (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8869179 (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 03/05 3:26 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent Letter & Form Wed 03/05 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/12/2025. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly J Gibbons on behalf of Defendant Seek Limited. (Gibbons, Molly)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Selby P Brown on behalf of Defendant Seek Limited. (Brown, Selby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Wed 02/05 11:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Seek Limited mailed on 12/5/2024 (Rava, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/11 2:05 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time for Service signed by Judge David W. Christel. If Plaintiff has not already filed a declaration of service within 90 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must file a status report regarding its efforts to effect service. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caleb Bacos on behalf of Plaintiff ZipStorm Inc. (Bacos, Caleb)
Related: [-]
utility Note re compliance with LCR 83.2 - Attorney Appearance and With Tue 12/10 9:10 AM
NOTE re Document5 Motion for Extension of Time. Appearance of attorney Caleb Bacos is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent to this attorney until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 12/09 6:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Service Under FRCP 4(m) , filed by Plaintiff ZipStorm Inc. Noting Date 12/9/2024, (Rava, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/18 6:52 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to Defendant Seek Limited. (MIH)(cc: Attorney Katie Christensen via Ad Hoc at KChristensen@perkinscoie.com)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Wed 09/18 6:45 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MIH)(cc: Attorney Katie Christensen via Ad Hoc at KChristensen@perkinscoie.com)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/18 6:28 PM
Judge David W. Christel added. (MIH)(cc: Attorney Katie Christensen via Ad Hoc at KChristensen@perkinscoie.com)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 09/12 3:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Zipstorm Inc.. (Rava, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) Seek Limited Related [+] Attorney William C Rava added to party Zipstorm Inc.(pty:pla) filed by Zipstorm Inc..(Rava, William)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8625068
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121),
Att: 8 Summons