Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 4:24-cv-03166
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
Represented By
Devin S. Hayes
Michael, Best Law Firm - Milwaukee
contact info
Michael K. Chropowicz
Michael, Best Law Firm - Chicago River Point
contact info
Margaret E. Schiefen
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Paxton
Represented By
Carolyn H. Cottrell
Schneider, Wallace Law Firm - Emeryville
contact info
Robert E. Morelli, III
Schneider, Wallace Law Firm - Emeryville
contact info
Esther L. Bylsma
Schneider, Wallace Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/08 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Amended Initial Disclosures by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 7:40 PM
NOTICE of Service of Amended Notices of Deposition by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 04/23 2:44 PM
TEXT ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend (Filing No. 26) at this time. The parties are directed to abide by the initial progression order and make efforts to schedule the necessary depositions. The court will consider a renewed motion, if necessary, during the call set for June 10, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (CEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 motion Extend Tue 04/22 6:46 PM
MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Operative Initial Progression Order (ECF No. 22) by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton.(Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Service of Notices of Deposition by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/30 7:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery Documents by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
23 23 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx Mon 12/23 11:29 AM
RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (ADB)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Mon 12/23 11:27 AM
INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER as to the First Phase of discovery - Status Conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings is set for 6/10/2025 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. First Phase Depositions due October 16, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (ADB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/16 7:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton.(Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/26 8:36 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice19 for attorney Michael K. Chropowicz. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 4:37 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5206919 by Attorney Michael K. Chropowicz on behalf of Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc..(Chropowicz, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice17 for attorney Devin S. Hayes. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 11:33 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5206256 by Attorney Devin S. Hayes on behalf of Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc..(Hayes, Devin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/15 4:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/16/2024.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/14 9:48 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. (Schiefen, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 order Reassignment Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings Tue 11/12 7:00 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER (TEXT ONLY) - Following Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson's swearing in as a United States Magistrate Judge on November 1, 2024, and in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Wed 10/16 9:13 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before November 14, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Tue 10/15 3:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Tenneco Inc., Corporate Parent Pegasus Holdings III, LLC, Corporate Parent Pegasus Holdings II, LLC, Corporate Parent Pegasus Holdings One (AP) Corp., Corporate Parent Pegasus Parent, LP, Corporate Parent AP IX Pegasus Holdings, LP for Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.. by Attorney Margaret E. Schiefen on behalf of Defendants Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc., Tenneco Inc., Pegasus Holdings III, LLC, Pegasus Holdings II, LLC, Pegasus Holdings One (AP) Corp., Pegasus Parent, LP, AP IX Pegasus Holdings, LP.(Schiefen, Margaret)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Tue 10/15 3:06 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Margaret E. Schiefen on behalf of Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc..(Schiefen, Margaret)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Margaret E. Schiefen on behalf of Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. (Schiefen, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/24 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company INC defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. on 9/24/2024. (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 11:00 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice7 for attorney Esther L. Bylsma. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
7 7 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/16 5:00 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Attorney Esther L. Bylsma Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5163094 by Attorney Esther L. Bylsma on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton.(Bylsma, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/13 8:00 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Attorney Letter Fri 09/13 7:58 AM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Esther L. Bylsma has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 09/13 7:52 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/12 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action (Kyle Paxton) by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Paxton(Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent by Kyle Paxton
2 2 service Summons Requested Thu 09/12 4:42 PM
Summons Requested as to Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. regarding Complaint,1 . (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand for Class and Collective Claims against Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5161697), by Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Kyle Paxton(Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet