Utah District Court
Judge:Dale A Kimball
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-00672
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 2:32 AM MDT
Defendant
Lone Peak Hospital
Represented By
Martine Wells
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Whitney Crofts
Represented By
David J. Holdsworth
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHC Payroll Agent
Terminated: 01/03/2025


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett W. Messerly on behalf of Lone Peak Hospital (Messerly, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 9:59 AM
DISCOVERY MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/7/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Fri 02/07 9:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2025. Expert Discovery due by 9/8/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2025. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/7/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Thu 02/06 7:20 PM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING.(Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 motion Scheduling Order Thu 02/06 7:14 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Whitney Crofts. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 order Order Thu 01/23 10:09 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ordered to comply with paragraph 3 of the 5 Order to Propose Schedule by February 6, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/23/2025. No attached document.(gdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 notice Notice From the Court Fri 01/03 8:31 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: On January 2, 2025, Plaintiff filed a14 Response to Order to Show Cause/Notice of Dismissal of Claims as Against CHC Payroll Agent, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal is self-effectuating. Pursuant to the terms of the notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed as to Defendant CHC Payroll Agent, Inc. without prejudice. No order will follow. (eat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 01/02 8:42 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Whitney Crofts. (Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
13 13 order Order Thu 12/19 9:18 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The time for service under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has passed with respect to Defendant CHC Payroll Agent, Inc., but no proof of service has been filed. By January 2, 2025, Plaintiff must file either: 1) proof of timely and proper service upon this defendant, or 2) a document setting forth good cause for a failure to timely serve this defendant, and describing any steps taken to serve this defendant and pursue this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/19/2024. No attached document.(gdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/18 7:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Lone Peak Hospital.(Wells, Martine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/04 9:41 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Lone Peak Hospital to answer or otherwise respond to the 2 Complaint is extended to December 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/4/2024. No attached document. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Tue 12/03 5:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Lone Peak Hospital. (Wells, Martine)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/03 5:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint filed by Defendant Lone Peak Hospital. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Attorney Martine Wells added to party Lone Peak Hospital(pty:dft)(Wells, Martine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/20 10:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Whitney Crofts. Summons as to Lone Peak Hospital. (Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 11/07 7:48 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Lone Peak Hospital. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 11/07 7:48 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to CHC Payroll Agent. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 09/16 3:04 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/16/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 09/13 8:26 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Whitney Crofts. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 10/4/2024. (kec)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/13 9:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/13/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
2 2 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 09/12 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against CHC Payroll Agent, Lone Peak Hospital (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5182206) filed by Whitney Crofts. (Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Thu 09/12 4:12 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Whitney Crofts is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]