Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10545

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles Novack
Case #: 1:24-bk-10513
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Napa Elm, LP, Debtor
6359 Auburn Blvd Ste B
Citrus Heights, CA 95621-5200
Represented By
Thomas B. Rupp
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
16 16 audio audio Fri 11/08 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 11/8/2024 11:00:39 AM ]. File Size [ 145352 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:31:24 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Thu 10/03 11:45 AM
Notice of Change of Address of Attorney Thomas Rupp . (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/26 1:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Phillip John Shine. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR (Shine, Phillip)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/26 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jared A. Day. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR (Day, Jared)
Related: [-]
order Judge Docket Order Thu 09/26 11:08 AM
An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of LeFever Mattson and its affiliate debtors. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, the docket of LeFever Mattson, Case No. 24-10545 and such docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this chapter 11 case. Related [+]. (rba)
Related: [-] 12 Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
12 12 14 pgs order Order Thu 09/26 11:07 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] of 24-40543 24-10544 24-10487 24-10488 24-10489 24-10490 24-10491 24-10492 24-10493 24-10494 24-10495 24-10496 24-10497 24-10498 24-10499 24-10500 24-10501 24-10502 24-10503 24-10504 24-10505 24-10506 24-10507 24-10508 24-10509 24-10510 24-10511 24-10512 24-10513 24-10514 24-10515 24-10516 24-10517 24-10518 24-10519 24-10520 24-10521 24-10522 24-10523 24-10524 24-10525 24-10526 24-10527 24-10528 24-10529 24-10530 24-10532 24-10533 24-10534 24-10535 24-10536 24-10537 24-10537 24-10417 24-10538 24-10539 24-10540 24-10541 24-10542 (rba)
Related: [-] 6 - 24-10545
Thursday, September 19, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order to File Missing Documents
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to File Missing Documents
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes Wed 09/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Reassignment of Case Wed 09/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Reassignment of Case. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order and Notice Reassigning Case
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
6 6 order File Missing Documents Tue 09/17 9:40 AM
Amended Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (pw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 order File Missing Documents Mon 09/16 4:16 PM
Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (pw)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Status Conference Chp 11 Mon 09/16 4:08 PM
Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 11/8/2024 at 11:00 AM in/via Oakland Room 215 - Novack. Status Conference Statement due by 11/1/2024 (pw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 order Reassigning Case Mon 09/16 10:25 AM
Order Transferring Related Cases to the Hon. Charles Novack. Judge Charles Novack added to case. Involvement of Judge William J. Lafferty Terminated. (ds)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Payment of Taxes Fri 09/13 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 09/13 4:04 PM
Judge William J. Lafferty added to case (trw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 09/12 5:50 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Napa Elm, LP. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 10/15/2024. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 09/19/2024. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Authorization
crditcrd none Thu 09/12 8:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10513 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33412091, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)