Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cathy Bissoon
Case #: 2:24-cv-01280
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 4:05 AM EST
Petitioner
GNC HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Brad A. Funari
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Respondent
LAC GLOBAL (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD.
Respondent
ONI GLOBAL PTE. LTD.


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 12/06 3:45 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LAC GLOBAL (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD., ONI GLOBAL PTE. LTD. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
11 11 3 pgs misc Request for Default Thu 12/05 1:21 PM
REQUEST by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC for entry of DEFAULT against LAC GLOBAL (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD., ONI GLOBAL PTE. LTD. . (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/22 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Thursday, September 12, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/12 12:40 PM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/12/2024. (jmm)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Thu 09/12 12:17 PM
ORDER. This case has been reassigned, as related to Civil Action No. 24-1279 The Order (Doc.2 ) granting Petitioner's Motion to seal (Doc.1 ) is vacated, for the same reasons stated in 24-1279 and the case sealing will be removed from the docket. Like in 24-1279 the Court expressly holds that Petitioner's presentment of the arbitration award in 24-1280 was made "in the course of enforcement"; Petitioner has taken all reasonable steps to preserve confidentiality; and publication of the award is appropriate. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/12/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/12 7:25 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is reassigned to Judge Cathy Bissoon as related to 2:24-cv-1279-CB. Judge William S. Stickman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/12/24. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts only notice on the matter. (cww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 172 pgs EXHIBITS in Support of5 Declaration by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
5 5 2 pgs DECLARATION re3 Complaint, by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (ert)
Related: [-]
4 4 12 pgs BRIEF in Support of3 Complaint, filed by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (ert) Exhibit A and B were meant for5 . Refiled at6 . Modified text on 9/11/2024. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
3 3 10 pgs COMPLAINT against LAC GLOBAL (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD., ONI GLOBAL PTE. LTD. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number 200010790), filed by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (ert) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/12/2024) (ept).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Receipt
2 2 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/10/24. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
1 1 3 pgs MOTION to Seal by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Receipt,
Att: 5 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 6 Exhibit A,
Att: 7 Exhibit B,
Att: 8 Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Declaration
Judge William S. Stickman added. (ert)
Related: [-]