Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-04111
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
John Does I-III
Defendant
Kevin Johnston
Represented By
T. Brandon Welch
Stillman Welch, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Madewell Concrete, LLC
Represented By
T. Brandon Welch
Stillman Welch, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzanne Estes
Represented By
Wesley A. Pickelsimer
Pickelsimer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chris Nesbitt
Represented By
Wesley A. Pickelsimer
Pickelsimer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luke Starnes
Represented By
Wesley A. Pickelsimer
Pickelsimer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maureen Starnes
Represented By
Wesley A. Pickelsimer
Pickelsimer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Arbitration Fri 10/11 4:16 PM
ORDER granting6 Consent MOTION to Stay Case and MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The Court compels arbitration pursuant to the parties' Arbitration Agreement. If the parties are unable to select an arbitrator, they may apply to the Court to designate and appoint an arbitrator. Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and, Alternatively, to Dismiss (Doc.2 ) is denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/11/2024. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
6 6 motion Stay Thu 10/10 2:46 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration by Kevin Johnston, Madewell Concrete, LLC.(Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/26 3:43 PM
ORDER granting4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Response to2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for responses to the Motion is extended by and through 10/11/2024. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/26/2024. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/25 12:32 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Response to Pending Motion re:2 MOTION to Compel ArbitrationMOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Johnston, Madewell Concrete, LLC.(Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Response Deadline
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 09/13 4:03 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Wesley A. Pickelsimer. Clerk to follow-up by 9/23/2024. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
2 2 motion Compel Dismiss Thu 09/12 4:36 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Kevin Johnston, Madewell Concrete, LLC.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kevin Johnston,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Johnston,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kevin Johnston
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/12 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Johnston, Madewell Concrete, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13716998)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet