Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Case #: 5:24-cv-01014
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 2:41 AM CST
Defendant
Alejandro Alanis
Defendant
Dispatch (Doe)
Defendant
Does 1-10, Inclusive
Defendant
Emilio Gomez
Defendant
Crystal LNU
Defendant
Officers (Does) 1-3
Defendant
Prosecutor (Doe)
Defendant
Officer R. Ramos
Defendant
San Antonio Police Dept.
Defendant
Tow Truck Operator (Doe)
Plaintiff
James L. Warneke
306 East Palfrey
San Antonio, TX 78223
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Judge Melissa Saenz
Terminated: 11/12/2024
Represented By
Jose Emmanuel Herrera
Bexar County District Attorney
contact info

GPO Nov 12 2024
ims for prospective relief are dismissed without prejudice to the extent constitutional standing is lacking. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Judge Saenz as a defendant in this litigation. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant Judge Melissa Saenz Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 5) and DISMISSES the claims asserted against Judge Saenz with prejudice. Any cla

Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/13 11:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant Judge Melissa Saenz Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 5) and DISMISSES the claims asserted against Judge Saenz with prejudice. Any claims for prospective relief are dismissed without prejudice to the extent constitutional standing is lacking. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Judge Saenz as a defendant in this litigation. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/18 4:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Melissa Saenz. (Herrera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order Mon 09/16 6:01 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 misc Case Opening Letter Fri 09/13 9:23 AM
Case Opening Letter TO James L. Warneke. (dtg)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/13 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Alejandro Alanis, Emilio Gomez, Crystal S., R. Ramos, Melissa Saenz. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 8:52 AM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number 5851), filed by James L. Warneke.(dtg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Exhibits to Complaint, A thru P, (Personal Information/Identifiers contained in the Exhibits),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Filing Fee Receipt,
Att: 4 Copy of Envelope
misc Remark (No Doc#) Thu 09/12 4:38 PM
THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K. PULLIAM. (dtg)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)***Modified TEXT TO REFLECT CORRECT FILING DATE FROM 9/12/2024 TO 9/5/2024 on 9/13/2024 (dtg).***
Related: [-]