Missouri Western District Court
Judge:David P Rush
Case #: 6:24-cv-03266
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Diocese of Springfield -Cape Girardeau
Defendant
Bishop Edward M. Rice
Plaintiff
B.A.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C.L.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D.B.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E.R.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G.T.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J.B.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J.B.2
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M.C.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M.D.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
P.D.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
V.F.
Represented By
Rebecca M. Randles
Randles Mata, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 12/02 2:19 PM
Order of Dismissal. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/27 3:55 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by All Parties (Randles, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 2:44 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward M. Rice. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 10/11 2:02 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 10/21/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
misc Filing Fee (Use only at the direction of the Clerk's Office) Mon 09/23 10:02 AM
FILING FEE for new civil case. Receipt no. AMOWDC-9213939 for $405 filing fee. (Randles, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 09/13 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
2 2 44 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rebecca M. Randles on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number 00000. Service due by 12/12/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Randles, Rebecca) (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/13/2024) Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Docket Modification Fri 09/13 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/12/2024 as Document No. 1, Complaint. The document has been deleted as the incorrect party was selected when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document selecting the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 09/13 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 10/4/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 9:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number 0000. Service due by 12/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Randles, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet