Murphy v. Warden Rule
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00867 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() USCA Case Number 25-10330 in United States Court of Appeals 5th Circuit for15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jennifer Murphy. (tle) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/25 5:09 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Mailed :Copy Notice of Appeal , Motion/IFP , Transcript Order Form Tue Feb 25 17:09:37 CST 2025 (crt) |
||
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit by Jennifer Murphy. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (tle) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the order denying petition signed this date, the petition of Jennifer Murphy under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/10/2025) (wxc) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER DENYING PETITION: Came on for consideration the petition of Jennifer Murphy for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241. Her petition is one of a series of petitions filed by prisoners at Federal Medical Center Carswell making similar allegations. Having considered the petition, the response, the reply, the record, and applicable authorities, the Court concludes that the petition must be DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/10/2025) (wxc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 02/10 1:51 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13,14. Mon Feb 10 13:51:42 CST 2025 (crt) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() REPLY filed by Jennifer Murphy re:10 Response/Objection (saw) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Appendix in Support filed by Warden Rule re10 Response/Objection (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann) |
|
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE filed by Warden Rule re:6 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann) |
|
9 | 9
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warden Rule. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION7 : The Court is satisfied that it would have been unrealistic given the volume of prisoner habeas litigation and inexpensive filing fee to set a shorter deadline for response. The objection is OVERRULED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/21/2024) (wxc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 11/21 2:49 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Nov 21 14:49:05 CST 2024 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion for the Court to Grant Writ Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Jennifer Murphy (wxc) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the petition and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ for Warden Rule added. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/4/2024) (wxc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 11/04 12:03 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Nov 4 12:03:23 CST 2024 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Public correspondence received from Jennifer Murphy. (wxc) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jennifer Murphy must address the following deficiency: In order to proceed with this habeas action, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the Courts form application. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 10/14/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/13/2024) (wxc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 09/13 12:54 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Sep 13 12:54:38 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 09/12 11:13 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Thu Sep 12 11:13:57 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Jennifer Murphy. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) |