Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:24-cv-02518
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Michael Gregorek
Represented By
Paul Matthew Grant
Goodreid & Grant LLC
contact info
Defendant
Chitkaranjeet Kenny Singh Sandhu
Represented By
Morgan Pullam
The Litigation Boutique
contact info
Leah P. VanLandschoot
The Litigation Boutique LLC
contact info
Defendant
Titan Advanced Manufacturing Inc.
Represented By
Morgan Pullam
The Litigation Boutique
contact info
Leah P. VanLandschoot
The Litigation Boutique LLC
contact info
Defendant
Titan Fittings, LLC
Represented By
Leah P. VanLandschoot
The Litigation Boutique LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC
Represented By
Julia Marie Peebles
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Kelsey J. Schmidt
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Brent Rollow Owen
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Special Master
Michael E. Hegarty


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
146 146 order Memorandum Fri 05/02 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding145 Unopposed MOTION to Strike141 Exhibits, to Titan Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/02/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
145 145 motion Strike Fri 05/02 3:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Strike141 Exhibits, to Titan Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff by Plaintiff Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC.(Owen, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Unopposed Motion to Strike Exhibits B, C, D and E,
Att: 2 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Strike Exhibits B, C, D and E
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
144 144 order Order Referring Motion Wed 04/30 5:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:139 Titan Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff and142 Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol and Obtain Additional Discovery (the "Motions"). The Motions are referred to Special Master. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/30/25. Text Only Entry (stvlc5, )
Related: [-]
143 143 order Memorandum Wed 04/30 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding142 MOTION to Enforce Forensic Protocol and Obtain Additional Discovery filed by Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/30/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
142 142 16 pgs motion Enforce Wed 04/30 4:41 PM
MOTION to Enforce Forensic Protocol and Obtain Additional Discovery by Plaintiff Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC.(Owen, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit A - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - Motion to Enforce Forensic Protocol
141 141 misc Exhibits Wed 04/30 4:38 PM
Exhibits in Support of139 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff by Defendants Titan Fittings, LLC, Chitkaranjeet Kenny Singh Sandhu, Titan Advanced Manufacturing Inc..(VanLandschoot, Leah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Compel,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Compel,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion to Compel,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Motion to Compel
140 140 order Memorandum Wed 04/30 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding139 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by Chitkaranjeet Kenny Singh Sandhu, Titan Fittings, LLC, Titan Advanced Manufacturing Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/30/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
139 139 motion Compel Wed 04/30 4:24 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff by Defendants Titan Fittings, LLC, Chitkaranjeet Kenny Singh Sandhu, Titan Advanced Manufacturing Inc.. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
Related: [-]
138 138 order Order Referring Motion Wed 04/30 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:136 Defendant Michael Gregorek's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Requests for Production of Documents and Answer Interrogatories (the "Motion"). The Motion is referred to Special Master. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/30/25. Text Only Entry (stvlc5, )
Related: [-]
137 137 order Memorandum Wed 04/30 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding136 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Requests for Production and Answer Interrogatories filed by Michael Gregorek. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/30/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
136 136 motion Compel Wed 04/30 12:19 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Requests for Production and Answer Interrogatories by Defendant Michael Gregorek.(Grant, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
135 135 respm Brief in Support of Motion Tue 04/29 11:27 AM
BRIEF in Support of124 MOTION for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint 59 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Accu-Precision Tool & Gauge Company LLC.(Owen, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint