California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:24-bk-11039
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 07, 2025

Debtor
Hillcrest Private Security, Inc.
4180 Via Real Ste B
Carpinteria, CA 93013-1265
Represented By
William C Beall
Beall And Burkhardt, Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 12:09 AM PDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 09/12 3:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:24-bk-11039] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57362755. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 09/12 2:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Hillcrest Private Security, Inc. (Beall, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vol 2
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 09/12 3:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Faith (TR), Jeremy W. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/30/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Faith: Meeting ID 973 812 7924, Passcode 8746194099, Phone 1 747 281 2473. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]