California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-07683
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
26 26 misc Mail Returned Fri 02/07 2:06 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Derrick L. Johnson BK.N0.6923133 re Order on Motion for Order25 (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
25 25 order For Order Thu 01/16 4:21 PM
ORDER DENYING RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Judge John F. Walter. Petitioner's Application19 ,20 ,21 is denied. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
24 24 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 01/13 5:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rules 6-1, 7-9, 7-10 motion, opposition, or reply papers untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 01/13 5:01 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rules 6-1, 7-9, 7-10 motion, opposition, or reply papers untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 01/13 4:59 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order lacks required text and signature for the Judge.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 3 pgs misc Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Mon 01/13 4:54 PM
MEMORANDUM20 filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (san)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs motion Order Mon 01/13 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (san) (san)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/13/2025) Proposed Order
19 19 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Mon 01/13 4:49 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (san)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 order Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC Thu 11/21 1:54 PM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF by Judge John F. Walter re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
17 17 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 11/21 1:52 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,16 Pursuant to the Order accepting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition in this matter is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
Related: [-]
16 16 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Thu 11/21 1:50 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge John F. Walter for Report and Recommendation (Issued)7 IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Report and Recommendation is accepted. 2. The Petition is denied as second or successive. 3. Judgment shall be entered dismissing this action without prejudice. 4. The Court Clerk shall serve this Order and the Judgment on all counsel or parties of record. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
15 15 order Relief Temporary Restraining Order Fri 11/08 3:44 PM
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF by Judge John F. Walter. Though the Applications are titled differently, they ask for the same relief: Petitioner asks this Court to immediately review his Petition, promptly order a response, expedite consideration of his Petition, and grant him relief9 ,10 ,11 ,12 . In essence, he wants to accelerate review of his Petition. The Applications are denied. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 misc Declaration Thu 11/07 11:28 AM
DECLARATION filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (et)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Show Cause Thu 11/07 11:25 AM
Proposed Order to Show Cause re: why a preliminary injunction should not issue filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 11/07 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to pursuant to FRCP 65 and L.R. 65-111 filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 11/07 11:23 AM
APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to pursuant to FRCP 65 and L.R. 65-1 filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed TRO
Friday, November 01, 2024
10 10 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 11/06 5:07 PM
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re9 filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Relief Wed 11/06 5:06 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION THE EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF SOUGHT filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Thu 10/24 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2024. (ch)
Related: [-]
7 7 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Thu 10/24 9:51 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
6 6 misc Response Wed 10/23 9:04 AM
RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause,5 filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/16 12:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Petitioner is therefore ORDERED to show cause why the Court should not recommend dismissal of the Petition. NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 16, 2024, Petitioner shall respond, in writing, to this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 09/13 4:31 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge George H Wu. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge George H Wu to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-07683 JFW(BFM). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Thu 09/12 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
2 2 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL Thu 09/12 9:51 AM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before a United States Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitoner Derrick L. Johnson. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Thu 09/12 9:48 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge George H Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff.(Filing fee $ 5 PAID), filed by Petitioner Derrick L. Johnson. (car)
Related: [-]