Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00267
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 1:21 AM MDT
Defendant
Elias David Lopez Andino (1)
Represented By
Richard James Banta
Richard J. Banta
contact info
Defendant
Alvin Perez Raudales (2)
Represented By
Aron Lee Israelite
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexander Edwin Duncan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 2:14 AM MDT
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Elias David Lopez Andino (1), Alvin Perez Raudales (2). (ccuen, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet PEREZ RAUDALES,
Att: 2 Criminal Information Sheet LOPEZ ANDINO,
Att: 3 Affidavit
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Elias David Lopez Andino. (ccuen, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Alvin Perez Raudales. (ccuen, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
4 4 Arrest of Elias David Lopez Andino. Initial Appearance set for 9/4/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Spanish Interpreter requested. (Text Only entry)(ccuen, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest of Alvin Perez Raudales. Initial Appearance set for 9/4/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Spanish Interpreter requested. (Text Only entry)(ccuen, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Appearance as to Elias David Lopez Andino held on 9/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised. Court appoints counsel. Government requests detention. Defendant contests detention. Detention Hearing set for 9/9/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Preliminary Examination set for 9/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Advisement pursuant to Brady v. Maryland. Defendant remanded. Hearing concluded. (Total time: 8 minutes, Hearing time: 2:34 - 2:42) APPEARANCES: Talia Bucci on behalf of the Government, Richard Banta on behalf of the defendant, Carlos Morales on behalf of pretrial. FTR: C205. Interpreter: Cathy Bahr. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Elias David Lopez Andino. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Elias David Lopez Andino by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/4/2024. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Appearance as to Alvin Perez Raudales held on 9/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised. Court appoints counsel. Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Government requests detention. Defendant does not contest detention. Defendant ordered detained. Advisement pursuant to Brady v. Maryland. Status Conference set for 9/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Defendant remanded. Hearing concluded. (Total time: 6 minutes, Hearing time: 2:56 - 3:02) APPEARANCES: Talia Bucci on behalf of the Government, Jared Westbroek on behalf of the defendant, Carlos Morales on behalf of pretrial. FTR: C205. Interpreter: Cathy Bahr. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alvin Perez Raudales. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Alvin Perez Raudales. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Alvin Perez Raudales by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/4/2024. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Aron Lee Israelite appearing for Alvin Perez RaudalesAttorney Aron Lee Israelite added to party Alvin Perez Raudales(pty:dft) (Israelite, Aron) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard James Banta appearing for Elias David Lopez AndinoAttorney Richard James Banta added to party Elias David Lopez Andino(pty:dft) (Banta, Richard) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/04/2024 in case as to Alvin Perez Raudales. (jrobe, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
16 16 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/04/2024 in case as to Elias David Lopez Andino. (jrobe, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
17 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Detention Hearing as to Elias David Lopez Andino held on 9/9/2024. Defendant present in custody. Government requests detention. Defendant does not contest detention. Defendant ordered detained. Defendant remanded. Hearing concluded. FTR: A501. Interpreter: Dave Roberts. (Total time: 5 minutes, Hearing time: 1:57 p.m.-2:02 p.m.) Text Only Entry. APPEARANCES: Candyce Cline on behalf of the Government, Richard Banta on behalf of the defendant, Seth Juker on behalf of pretrial.(cthom, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alvin Perez Raudales by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/6/2024. (msmot, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Elias David Lopez Andino by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/9/2024. (cthom, ) [1:24-mj-00165-SBP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
20 20 INDICTMENT as to Elias David Lopez Andino (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 and Alvin Perez Raudales (2) count(s) 1, 5. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Information Sheet
21 21 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 4: as to Elias David Lopez Andino, Alvin Perez Raudales. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]