Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-59671

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:24-bk-59673
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.
2675 Breckinridge Blvd Ste 300
Duluth, GA 30096-8953
Represented By
Michael D. Robl
Robl Law Group LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
22 22 misc 0-Certificate of Service Tue 05/13 4:27 PM
Certificate of Service of Amendment to Schedules: Schedule E/F filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. Related [+] (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-] 21
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Tue 05/13 2:23 PM
Notice that the Amendment to Schedules: Schedule E/F filed by Michael D. Robl is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Certificate of Service Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 21
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Tue 05/13 2:25 PM
Notice that the Amendment to Schedules: Schedule E/F filed by Michael D. Robl is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Summary of Assets and Liabilities Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, May 12, 2025
21 21 misc P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE) Mon 05/12 7:57 PM
Amendment to Schedules: Schedule E/F, (creditors added by upload) Fee $ 34 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 05/12 7:58 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules D,E,F and/or E/F (FEE)([LINK 24-59673 sms] ) [misc,729] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A63214748. Fee Amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#21
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 04/22 12:39 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Mon 04/21 11:59 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Sun 03/02 11:13 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 02/28 9:38 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59673 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 01/29 9:49 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59673 for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 filed by Maxwell William Bowen on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Bowen, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 01/17 10:02 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59673 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 01/15 1:36 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59673 for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
notice Notice of No Appointment of Creditors' Committee Wed 10/16 12:09 PM
The United States Trustee for Region 21 reports that no committee of creditors holding unsecured claims has been appointed in this case. filed by Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
misc Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Thu 10/17 12:55 PM
Section 341(a) meeting held and concluded. (jar)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 28, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Sun 09/29 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 09/26 3:40 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural, but notsubstantive, consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases listed below. The docket in case number 24-59671 SMS should be consulted for allmatters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases a jointly administered: Case No. 24-59671 SMS, Case No. 24-59673 SMS, Case No. 24-59675 SMS, and Case No. 24-59729 SMS Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 order Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 09/26 3:39 PM
Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 9/26/2024. (cws)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
misc Hearing Held Tue 09/24 2:50 PM
Hearing Held: Order to be submitted re: Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, September 23, 2024
10 10 misc 0-Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 5:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Motion to Set Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions (Doc. No. 10); Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases (Doc. No. 7); Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Employees Benefits Arising Prior to Entry of Order for Relief (Doc. No. 8); and Debtors Emergency Motion to Set Expedited Hearing on Debtors Motion for Joint Administration and Debtors Motion for Authority to Pay Employee Benefits (Doc. No. 9) filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. Related [+] (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 09/20 12:01 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors mailed to Schedule G parties filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. Related [+] (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-] 5
8 8 misc 0-Change of Address (document requesting) Fri 09/20 11:22 AM
Change of Address of City of Auburn Hills, City of East Lansing, City of Flatrock, City of Lapeer, City of Owosso, Eastpointe Comm Schools, Monroe Public Schools, Warren Consolidated Schools, Warren Education Association, Warren Woods School, Washtenaw Intermediate Schools, Wayne County Community College, Wayne Westland Community, Wyandotte Public Schools, Ypsilanti Community Schools for Notices and Payments filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 09/19 4:11 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration filed by Maxwell William Bowen on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Bowen, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Thu 09/19 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Mon 09/16 11:57 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 10/16/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition Mon 09/16 9:51 AM
Amendment to Voluntary Petition to: Update petition after conversion, The Voluntary Petition is amended to remove the Subchapter V designation. filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. Related [+] (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 misc P-Corporate Resolution Fri 09/13 11:33 AM
Corporate Resolution filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of United States Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 09/13 9:35 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Subchapter V Filed by Michael D. Robl of Robl Law Group LLC on behalf of Employee Benefits Concepts, Inc.. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 12/12/2024. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Fri 09/13 9:54 AM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-59673 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A61811057. Fee Amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1