Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-61240

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary Ann Whipple
Case #: 6:24-ap-06040
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stark Federal Credit Union
4100 Dressler Road NW
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
Stark Federal Credit Union
contact info
Plaintiff
Derict Terrell Hawkins
3404 14th St SW, Apt B
Canton, OH 44710
Represented By
Erich J. Maier
Erich J. Maier Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 12/12 9:30 AM
Disposition of Adversary 6:24-ap-6040 Voluntary Dismissal (hlawh)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/12 9:32 AM
Adversary Case 6:24-ap-6040 Closed (hlawh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
court Hearing Not Held Wed 11/27 12:00 PM
Hearing Not Held - 12/2/2024 Hearing Not Held. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed Related [+] (aprib)
Related: [-] 9 Hearing Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/26 10:11 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Derict Terrell Hawkins. (Maier, Erich aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2024
11 11 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Mon 11/11 12:12 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 11/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 BNC Clerks Entry of Default Sat 11/09 12:12 AM
Clerks Entry of Default w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 order Set Hearing (PDF) Fri 11/08 1:43 PM
Hearing Order signed on 11/8/2024 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/2/2024 at 03:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (lbald crt)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 11/08 12:14 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/06 4:47 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default on Stark Federal Credit Union Related [+] (krupe)
Related: [-] 6 Order (PDF)
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Tue 11/05 4:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order and Direction for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed on 11/5/2024 Related [+]. (lbald crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/05 1:20 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Derict Terrell Hawkins (Maier, Erich aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 court Proceeding Memo Mon 11/04 3:39 PM
Proceeding Memo- Hearing held. Motion for Default on/before 7 days. 1. Clerk's Entry of Default to issue. 2. Cert. mail green card to be attached to MFDJ. Related [+] (lbald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 09/16 9:30 AM
Summons Service Executed on Stark Federal Credit Union 9/16/2024 (Maier, Erich aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Fri 09/13 9:02 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Stark Federal Credit Union Answer due 10/15/2024. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/4/2024 at 02:00 PM at Ralph Regula U.S. Courthouse, Canton - Courtroom. (aprib)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Derict Terrell Hawkins
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 2:17 PM
Adversary case 24-06040 Complaint by Derict Terrell Hawkins against Stark Federal Credit Union. Fee Amount $000 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Maier, Erich aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference