Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-01111
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 5:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Judith Beasley
Defendant
Freeman Webb Company, Realtors
Defendant
Brook Gipson
Defendant
Bret Harris
Plaintiff
Karen DeMoor
415 Rome Pike, Apt 5101
Lebanon, TN 37087


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
7 7 order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 05/23 2:51 PM
ORDER: The IFP Application (Doc. No.2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The plaintiff MUST submit an amended IFP Application within 30 DAYS from the entry of this Order. The plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. No.3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/23/2025. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 09/13 4:39 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 09/13 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 09/13 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 09/13 4:37 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Karen DeMoor. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/13 4:36 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Karen DeMoor. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Judith Beasley, Freeman Webb Company, Realtors, Brook Gipson, Bret Harris, filed by Karen DeMoor.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 09/13 4:40 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
Related: [-]