Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:24-cv-03269
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 5:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Deanna Brewer
Represented By
Corey E Kilburn
Roundtable Legal
contact info
Defendant
First Round Fitness LLC
Represented By
Corey E Kilburn
Roundtable Legal
contact info
Plaintiff
9Round Franchising, LLC
Represented By
Beau Jackson
Husch Blackwell Llp - Kcmo
contact info
Jennifer E. Hoekel
Husch Blackwell Llp - Stl
contact info
Timothy L. Capria
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 utility Patent/Trademark Report Wed 01/22 4:10 PM
Report on the determination of an action regarding trademark number(s) 3,601,884; 4,571,726; 4,818,919; 5,233,948; 4,713,987; 6,797,212;7,002,025; 7,002,027; 7,134,313; PA0001690875; TX0008816785; PA0002449571. Plaintiff(s): 9Round Franchising, LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Jennifer E. Hoekel Husch Blackwell LLP - StL 8001 Forsyth Boulevard Ste 1500 St. Louis, MO 63105; Timothy L. Capria 501 Commerce Street Suite 1620 Nashville, TN 37203 Defendant(s): First Round Fitness LLC & Deanna Brewer Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): Corey E Kilburn RoundTable Legal 4730 South National Ave Suite B1 Springfield, MO 65810 The final order is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 2:16 PM
ORDER granting15 motion for joint agreed order. Pursuant to a settlement agreement between the parties, this dispute is concluded and 9Round's claims against First Round Fitness LLC and Deanna Brewer are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 01/21/2025 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Rotellini, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Modification Tue 01/21 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/17/2025 as Document No. 14-1, Proposed Joint Agreed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 3 pgs motion Order Fri 01/17 3:19 PM
Joint MOTION for order agreed filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/31/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs motion Order Fri 01/17 2:17 PM
Joint MOTION for order to Enter Parties' Joint Agreed Order filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/31/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/12 2:17 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendants may file an answer to the complaint on or before January 13, 2025. Signed on 12/12/2024 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Rotellini, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/10 4:37 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint,,,, filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, November 08, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/08 9:32 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendants may file an answer to the complaint on or before 12/12/2024. Signed on 11/08/2024 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Rotellini, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/07 2:03 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint,,,, filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/25 11:17 AM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by 9Round Franchising, LLC. Waiver sent to First Round Fitness LLC on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/25 11:15 AM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by 9Round Franchising, LLC. Waiver sent to Deanna Brewer on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/16 8:29 AM
ORDER granting4 &5 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Timothy L. Capria and Jennifer E. Hoekel for 9Round Franchising, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of MAPNII Fri 09/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/13 4:26 PM
Motion to allow Jennifer E. Hoekel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9201942) filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/13 4:25 PM
Motion to allow Timothy L. Capria to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9201932) filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Fri 09/13 4:23 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of Plaintiff 9Round Franchising, LLC.(Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE of filing Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark by 9Round Franchising, LLC re1 Complaint,,, (Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Deanna Brewer, First Round Fitness LLC filed by Beau Jackson on behalf of 9Round Franchising, LLC. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9201834. Service due by 12/12/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Jackson, Beau)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Registration No. 3,601,884,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Registration No. 4,571,726,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Registration No. 6,797,212,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Registration No. 4,713,987,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Registration No. 7,002,025,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Registration No. 7,002,027,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 Registration No. 7,134,313,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 Registration No. 4,818,919,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 Registration No. 5,233,948,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Registration No. PA0001690875,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Registration No. TX0008816785,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 Registration No. PA0002449571,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 First Round Website Aug 2024,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 First Round Website Sept 2024,
Att: 15 Civil Cover Sheet