Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:24-cv-01558
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause30:181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 3:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
1849 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
Represented By
Luther Langdon Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians
1245 Fulton Avenue
Coos Bay, OR 97420
Represented By
Richard Kirk Eichstaedt
Rey-Bear Mclaughlin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 order Dismissal - Case Fri 01/03 12:04 PM
Order Dismissing Case based on the Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal9 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
9 9 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Thu 01/02 10:45 AM
Motion /Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice . Filed by Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians. (Eichstaedt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Mon 11/25 2:30 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer7 . Answer is due by 1/17/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 11/19 2:34 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Hajek, Luther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 12:28 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Bureau of Ocean Energy Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 09/16 12:26 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 1/14/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/13/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 2/13/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (sss)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 service Proposed Summons Fri 09/13 4:19 PM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians. (Eichstaedt, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Fri 09/13 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians. (Eichstaedt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
2 2 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/13 3:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians. (Eichstaedt, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 3:33 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9576113 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua & Siuslaw Indians against Bureau of Ocean Energy Management. (Eichstaedt, Richard)
Related: [-]