New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-00867
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated
Represented By
Karla S. Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Ortiz
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 E. 18 Street
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottfried & Gottfried, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Saturday, February 08, 2025
13 13 order Text Order Sat 02/08 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: The notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice filed by the plaintiff, Docket Item12 , is ordered. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/8/2025. (CRT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/07 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Ortiz (LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
11 11 order ~Util - Terminate Motions Text Order Mon 01/13 9:09 PM
TEXT ORDER re10 Joint MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines for 30 Days filed by the defendant. All deadlines in this case are extended until 2/12/2025. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/13/2025. (CRT)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stay Mon 01/13 1:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay all Case Deadlines for thirty (30) days from January 13, 2025 to February 12, 2025 by The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated.(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 order ~Util - Terminate Motions Text Order Wed 12/11 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER granting motion for an extension of time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by the defendant, Docket Item8 , until 1/13/2025. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/11/2024. (CRT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/10 4:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint until January 13, 2025 by The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated.(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
utility Remark Mon 11/18 3:55 PM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
7 7 order ~Util - Terminate Motions Text Order Tue 11/12 9:35 AM
TEXT ORDER granting motion for an extension of time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by the defendant, Docket Item6 , until 12/12/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/12/2024. (CRT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/11 3:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint until December 12, 2024 by The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated.(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/11 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karla S. Del Pozo Garcia on behalf of The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated (Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 11/05 1:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Colleen Banahan, NYS Sect of State, Agent on Oct. 21, 2024, filed by Joseph Ortiz. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated. (JLV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/16 10:09 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/16 10:10 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JLV)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 09/16 10:10 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(JLV)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 7:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Gottlieb on behalf of Joseph Ortiz (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 7:06 PM
COMPLAINT against The Economist Newspaper, N.A., Incorporated $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5280517, filed by Joseph Ortiz.(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet