North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:24-cv-00832
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC
Represented By
Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog, LLP
contact info
Benjamin Robert Holland
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Moncayo
Represented By
Jean S. Martin
Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
Matthew R. Gunter
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Thu 03/06 3:53 PM
STATUS REPORT On Arbitration (Joint) by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 12/06 7:48 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The parties are ORDERED to submit the matter to arbitration in accordance with the Arbitration Agreement. This matter is STAYED pending the outcome of the parties binding arbitration. See 9 U.S.C. § 3. The parties shall file a status report 90 days from the date of this Order and every 90 days thereafter until the arbitration is completed. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 12/5/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/06 7:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/6/2025 (brl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 11/26 4:23 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion to Stay Initial Attorney's Conference (IAC) pending resolution of Defendant's 10 Motion to Compel Arbitration. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/26/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
14 14 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/22 2:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 Consent MOTION to Stay re Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference,,,10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stay Fri 11/22 2:54 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay re Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference,,,10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. Responses due by 12/6/2024 (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 11/19 8:31 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/10/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/15 4:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
11 11 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/15 3:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Compel Fri 11/15 3:43 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2024 (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michelle Appleyard with Exhibits
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/15 3:40 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC.(Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/25 3:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC, filed by Kayla Moncayo.(Gunter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton on behalf of Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC (Hamilton, Meredith)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Robert Holland on behalf of Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC (Holland, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/19 8:02 AM
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew R. Gunter for Kayla Moncayo. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 9/18/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 09/18 6:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew R. Gunter, Esq. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6670636. by Kayla Moncayo. (Gunter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/17 1:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kayla Moncayo. Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC waiver sent on 9/16/2024, answer due 11/15/2024. (Martin, Jean)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 8:12 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Mon 09/16 8:10 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (cjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Driven Brands Shared Services, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6665520), filed by Kayla Moncayo.(Martin, Jean)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/16 8:09 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cjs)
Related: [-]