Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-cv-01076
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Jamie McGregor
Represented By
Philip Robert Brinson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
USA Rugby Corporation
Represented By
Philip Robert Brinson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin X. Hale
2904 Sprouted Grain
Seguin, TX 78155


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 notice Notice Fri 04/25 1:44 PM
Plaintiff's Statement in Support of Consolidation by Justin X. Hale. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 2:26 PM
ORDER to File Statement on or Before April 25, 2025. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 04/10 2:23 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED: referred7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ,6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ,13 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/09 4:42 PM
Text Order REFERRING6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant McGregor's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/09 4:43 PM
Text Order REFERRING7 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant USA Rugby Corporation's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Wed 04/09 4:45 PM
Text Order REFERRING13 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
29 29 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 8:41 AM
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/9/2026 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 2/28/2025, ADR Report Deadline due by 6/1/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 7/11/2025, Discovery due by 10/3/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 7/11/2025, and Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2025. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 02/27 8:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Initial Pretrial Conference held by telephone on 2/26/2025. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically) (Court Reporter web ex.)(cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
27 27 respm Surreply to Motion Tue 02/11 11:03 AM
Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Justin X. Hale, re6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Jamie McGregor,7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant USA Rugby Corporation. (cnr)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/11 8:17 AM
Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by Phone . Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 9:30 A.M. before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cnr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 02/10 10:08 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the lack of opposition, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's sur-reply, (Dkt. 22-1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 notice Notice Fri 01/24 4:37 PM
NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by USA Rugby Corporation (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice Fri 01/24 4:35 PM
NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Jamie McGregor (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 01/24 4:33 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order by Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation. (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Fri 01/24 4:32 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Replies to Plaintiff's Responses in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss, filed by Justin X. Hale. (Attachment(s) : #1 Exhibit) (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/21 1:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Justin X. Hale, re13 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Justin X. Hale. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 3:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by USA Rugby Corporation, re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant USA Rugby Corporation (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 3:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jamie McGregor, re6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Jamie McGregor (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Fri 01/10 4:07 PM
Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/24/2025. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/09 3:03 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation, re13 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Justin X. Hale First Amended Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/09 2:45 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation, re13 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Justin X. Hale Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 5:29 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Justin X. Hale, re6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Jamie McGregor. (cnr)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 5:27 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Justin X. Hale, re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant USA Rugby Corporation. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
13 13 motion Amend Complaint Thu 01/02 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Justin X. Hale.(dm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Amended Complaint
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 01/02 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin X. Hale. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 2:46 PM
ORDER Striking 10 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due on or before January 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
10 10 88 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/26 11:29 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation amending3 Amended Complaint, filed by Justin X. Hale.(dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
9 9 14 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 12:04 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by USA Rugby Corporation.(Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
8 8 14 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 12:03 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Jamie McGregor.(Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
7 7 17 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 11/04 12:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by USA Rugby Corporation.(Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 16 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 11/04 12:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Jamie McGregor.(Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/31 10:48 AM
Text Order GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint on or before November 4, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 11/01 11:34 AM
Reset Deadlines: Jamie McGregor answer due 11/4/2024; USA Rugby Corporation answer due 11/4/2024. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/30 1:50 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Agreed Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation.(Brinson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/10 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin X. Hale. Jamie McGregor served on 10/1/2024, answer due 10/22/2024; USA Rugby Corporation served on 10/1/2024, answer due 10/22/2024. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 46 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/23 11:18 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation amending1 Complaint., filed by Justin X. Hale.(dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
2 2 3 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 09/13 1:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Jamie McGregor, USA Rugby Corporation. (cr5)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 1945), filed by Justin X. Hale.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 20 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 1 pgs Receipt
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/13 12:56 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 09/13 12:57 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]