Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 1:24-cv-00428
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 3:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Kano Labs LLC
an Idaho limited liability company 2966 Escalante Ave
Idaho Falls, ID 83404
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Olsen Taggart PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kendon Howard
an individual 2966 Escalante Ave
Idaho Falls, ID 83404
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Olsen Taggart PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Centuria S.R.L.
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Tue 12/17 8:54 AM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (hs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Number Change Tue 12/17 9:03 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Amanda K Brailsford for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:24-cv-00428-AKB (hs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
11 11 order Order Wed 11/13 2:15 PM
DOCKET ORDER VACATING the Litigation Order (Dkt. 3). At the request of the parties, the dates for the parties to file a Joint Litigation Plan and a Discovery Plan, and the telephonic scheduling conference set for November 18, 2024 are HEREBY VACATED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 6). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (LT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
10 10 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/05 8:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss "Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens" filed by Centuria S.R.L.. Replies due by 11/19/2024.(Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 2:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kendon Howard, Kano Labs LLC. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
8 8 misc Consent Filed Wed 10/16 11:48 AM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (hs)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Wed 10/16 7:34 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Centuria S.R.L., Kendon Howard, Kano Labs LLC re1 Complaint,6 MOTION to Dismiss "Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens" Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/16/2024. (hs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/16 7:35 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 3:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss "Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens" Steven L Taggart appearing for Defendants Kendon Howard, Kano Labs LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2024 (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/24 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centuria S.R.L.. Kendon Howard served on 9/22/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/24 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centuria S.R.L.. Kano Labs LLC served on 9/22/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 order Litigation Order Mon 09/16 2:06 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2024 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. On or before November 12, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 8:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Kendon Howard, Kano Labs LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
1 1 90 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 9:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Kendon Howard, Kano Labs LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2811429.), filed by Centuria SRL.(Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet