Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00174
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 1:15 AM MDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Candyce C. Cline
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Brevin Pogue (1)
Terminated: 09/12/2024
Represented By
Laura Hayes Suelau
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/26/2024 1:39 PM MDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 1 pgs RULE 5 AFFIDAVIT as to Brevin Pogue from the District of USDC Eastern District of Texas. as to Brevin Pogue (1). (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Sealed Complaint,
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet
2 2 Arrest of Brevin Pogue(Text Only entry) Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 9/12/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
3 3 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Brevin Pogue held on 9/12/2024 Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised. Court appoints counsel. Government requests detention. Defendant ordered detained. Waiver of Preliminary/Identity/Detention Hearings executed. Defendant remanded. Hearing concluded. FTR: A501. (Total time: 6 minutes, Hearing time: 2:39 p.m.-2:45 p.m.) Text Only Entry. APPEARANCES: Candyce Cline on behalf of the Government, Laura Suelau on behalf of the defendant, Daisy Rodriguez on behalf of pretrial.(cthom, )
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Brevin Pogue by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Brevin Pogue. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Brevin Pogue. Defendant committed to District of Eastern District of Texas. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2024. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Eastern District of Texas of Rule 5 or 32 or 40 Initial Appearance: Please use PACER court links to access the public docket and documents. If the District of Colorado has a surrendered passport, it is being mailed to your court via USPS certified mail with return receipt. For a bond transmittal, please contact our case administration specialist at [cod.docketing.uscourts.gov] If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, please send your request to InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. as to Brevin Pogue Your case number is:4:24-mj-567-AGD. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
Related: [-]
8 8 MAGISTRATE CASE TERMINATED as to Brevin Pogue on 9/12/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
Related: [-]