Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01391
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 12:44 AM MST
Defendant
Lorenzo Llamas-Espino (1)
Represented By
Karina Janine Ordonez
Karina Ordonez Law Office PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ross Gabriel Arellano Edwards
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 2:22 AM MST
Sunday, July 28, 2024
Arrest of Lorenzo Llamas-Espina on 7/28/2024. (AO) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espina. (AO) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Initial Appearance as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espina held on 7/30/2024. Defendant states his TRUE NAME to be LORENZO LLAMAS-ESPINO . The record shall so reflect. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds the defendant indigent and appoints CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez as counsel of record. The Government is seeking detention. Defendant waives a formal reading, waives the Preliminary Hearing, and submits the issue of detention to the Court. The Court finds that probable cause has been established and further finds by a preponderance of the evidence the defendant is a flight risk. Defendant ordered to remain detained pending further proceedings. SPANISH INTERPRETER REQUIRED FOR DEFENDANT . As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Matthew Williams on behalf of AUSA Ross Arellano Edwards for the Government, CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody, assisted by Spanish Interpreter Matt Ren. Related [+] Hearing held 3:04 PM to 3:11 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 7/30/2024. (MRH) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espino. The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending further proceedings in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 7/30/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Lorenzo Llamas-Espino.(Ordonez, Karina) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espino (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/31/2024. (EC) [2:24-mj-09266-ESW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espino (1) count(s) 1. (RMW)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Lorenzo Llamas-Espino. (RMW)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Lorenzo Llamas-Espino for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (RMW)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M Lanham. Filed by USA as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espino. (RMW)
Related: [-]
12 12 IT IS ORDERED setting a change of plea hearing (30 mins) as to Lorenzo Llamas-Espino for 9/10/2024 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine.(DMF/ah)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]