Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-05264
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 12:45 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Edgar Camacho-Maldonado (1)
Terminated: 08/26/2024
Represented By
J Bert Vargas
Bv Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 2:25 AM MST
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
Arrest of Edgar Camacho-Maldonado on 8/7/2024. (ARS) [4:24-mj-02399-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Edgar Camacho-Maldonado. (ARS) [4:24-mj-02399-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Edgar Camacho-Maldonado held on 8/9/2024. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Brian Hopkins, duty for the Government, AFPD John Connelly, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Liliana Nido-Zawacki assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 8/23/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/23/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Related [+] Hearing held 2:05 pm to 2:30 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02399-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald.(BHA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-02399-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney J Bert Vargas, CJA for Edgar Camacho-Maldonado. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) [4:24-mj-02399-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 INFORMATION - Felony as to Edgar Camacho-Maldonado (1) count(s) 1, 2. (SCA)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Edgar Camacho-Maldonado. (SCA)
Related: [-]